Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3223722

EP3223722 - NAVIGATION INSTRUMENTS FOR SUBCHONDRAL BONE TREATMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  13.05.2019
Database last updated on 19.08.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  06.07.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  01.09.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  23.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip13.05.2019New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Zimmer Knee Creations, Inc.
841 Springdale Drive
Exton, PA 19341 / US
[2017/40]
Inventor(s)01 / HANSON, Shaun B.
1585 Sundance Drive
West Chester, Pennsylvania 19380 / US
02 / MANDEEN, Christopher D.
841 Springdale Drive
Exton, Pennsylvania 19341 / US
03 / SHARKEY, Peter F.
615 Creighton Road
Villanova, Pennsylvania 19085 / US
[N/P]
Former [2017/40]01 / HANSON, Shaun B.
1585 Sundance Drive
West Chester, Pennsylvania 19380 / US
02 / MANDEEN, Christopher D.
302 East Marshall Street
Apt. 536
West Chester, Pennsylvania 19380 / US
03 / SHARKEY, Peter F.
615 Creighton Road
Villanova, Pennsylvania 19085 / US
Representative(s)Mays, Julie , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London, EC1A 4HD / GB
[2017/40]
Application number, filing date15805373.624.11.2015
[2017/40]
WO2015US62404
Priority number, dateUS201462083456P24.11.2014         Original published format: US 201462083456 P
[2017/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016085973
Date:02.06.2016
Language:EN
[2016/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3223722
Date:04.10.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.06.2016
[2017/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP02.06.2016
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/17, A61B17/88
[2017/40]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/40]
TitleGerman:NAVIGATIONSINSTRUMENT FÜR SUBCHONDRALE KNOCHENBEHANDLUNG[2017/40]
English:NAVIGATION INSTRUMENTS FOR SUBCHONDRAL BONE TREATMENT[2017/40]
French:INSTRUMENTS DE NAVIGATION POUR UN TRAITEMENT DE L'OS SOUS-CHONDRAL[2017/40]
Entry into regional phase22.06.2017National basic fee paid 
22.06.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
22.06.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.06.2017Examination requested  [2017/40]
22.06.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
12.02.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.07.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.11.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.05.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
05.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[XAI]WO2014053913  (ZIMMER KNEE CREATIONS INC [US]) [X] 1,2,4-9 * figures 1-13C * [A] 3 [I] 10;
 [X]WO2011063281  (KNEE CREATIONS LLC [US], et al) [X] 1 * figure 2A *;
 [X]WO2011063267  (KNEE CREATIONS LLC [US], et al) [X] 1 * figure 6A *