Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3227739

EP3227739 - AUTOFOCUS CAMERA AND OPTICAL DEVICE WITH VARIABLE FOCAL LENGTH INTENDED TO BE INTEGRATED INTO SUCH A CAMERA [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  11.01.2019
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.09.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  31.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.12.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Webster Capital LLC
Corporation Trust Center
1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, Delaware 19801 / US
[2017/41]
Inventor(s)01 / BOLIS, Sébastien
107 impasse Jacques Brel
38920 Crolles / FR
 [2017/41]
Representative(s)Lang, Johannes
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
[2017/41]
Application number, filing date15805450.203.12.2015
[2017/41]
WO2015EP78563
Priority number, dateFR2014006190704.12.2014         Original published format: FR 1461907
[2017/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016087602
Date:09.06.2016
Language:EN
[2016/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3227739
Date:11.10.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.06.2016
[2017/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP09.06.2016
ClassificationInternational:G02B13/00, G02B13/16, G02B26/00, G02B7/02
[2017/41]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/41]
TitleGerman:AUTOFOKUSKAMERA UND OPTISCHE VORRICHTUNG MIT VARIABLER BRENNWEITE ZUR INTEGRATION IN SOLCH EINE KAMERA[2017/41]
English:AUTOFOCUS CAMERA AND OPTICAL DEVICE WITH VARIABLE FOCAL LENGTH INTENDED TO BE INTEGRATED INTO SUCH A CAMERA[2017/41]
French:CAMÉRA À MISE AU POINT AUTOMATIQUE, ET DISPOSITIF OPTIQUE AYANT UNE LONGUEUR FOCALE VARIABLE ET CONÇU POUR ÊTRE INTÉGRÉ DANS LADITE CAMÉRA[2017/41]
Entry into regional phase31.05.2017National basic fee paid 
31.05.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
31.05.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.05.2017Examination requested  [2017/41]
31.05.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
10.01.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.01.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.04.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
12.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
13.12.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[XYI]US2010118414  (BOLIS SEBASTIEN [FR]) [X] 1-3,13,14,16 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0003] - [0019] , [0021] , [0055] - [0079] - [0099] , [0118] , [0119] * [Y] 10,17 [I] 4-9,17;
 [XY]US2010208357  (BATCHKO ROBERT G [US], et al) [X] 1,2,15,16 * abstract * * paragraphs [0088] , [0093] , [0099] , [0101] - [0103] - [0110] , [0118] , [0124] - [0127] - [0140] , [0154] - [0167] * [Y] 17;
 [Y]US2007030573  (BATCHKO ROBERT G [US], et al) [Y] 10 * paragraphs [0137] - [0139]; figures 6c,7,21,25,28,67a,67b *;
 [A]JP2011112757  (KONICA MINOLTA HOLDINGS INC) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *