Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3156413

EP3156413 - GANIRELIX PRECURSOR AND METHOD FOR PREPARING GANIRELIX ACETATE BY USING ANIRELIX PRECURSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  20.03.2017
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  11.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip11.07.2019Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hybio Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd
4th Floor Office Building
Hybio Medicine Park
Hi-Tech Industrial Park Central
Nanshan District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN
[2017/16]
Inventor(s)01 / CHEN, Youjin
4th Floor OfficeBuilding
Hybio Medicine Park
Middle Zone
Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
02 / LIU, Jian
4th Floor OfficeBuilding
Hybio Medicine Park
Middle Zone
Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
03 / MA, Yaping
4th Floor OfficeBuilding
Hybio Medicine Park
Middle Zone
Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
04 / YUAN, Jiancheng
4th Floor OfficeBuilding
Hybio Medicine Park
Middle Zone
Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
 [2017/16]
Representative(s)Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP
Redcliff Quay
120 Redcliff Street
Bristol BS1 6HU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2017/16]Brown, David Leslie
Haseltine Lake LLP
Redcliff Quay
120 Redcliff Street
Bristol BS1 6HU / GB
Application number, filing date15805742.212.06.2015
[2017/16]
WO2015CN81311
Priority number, dateCN20141026564713.06.2014         Original published format: CN201410265647
[2017/16]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015188774
Date:17.12.2015
Language:ZH
[2015/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3156413
Date:19.04.2017
Language:EN
[2017/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN17.12.2015
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:C07K7/23, C07K1/06, C07K7/06, C07K1/04, C07K1/107
[2017/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/16]
TitleGerman:GANIRELIXVORLÄUFER UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES GANIRELIXACETATS MITTELS EINES ANIRELIXVORLÄUFERS[2017/16]
English:GANIRELIX PRECURSOR AND METHOD FOR PREPARING GANIRELIX ACETATE BY USING ANIRELIX PRECURSOR[2017/16]
French:PRÉCURSEUR DU GANIRÉLIX ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DE L'ACÉTATE DE GANIRÉLIX AU MOYEN DUDIT PRÉCURSEUR DU GANIRÉLIX[2017/16]
Entry into regional phase11.01.2017Translation filed 
11.01.2017National basic fee paid 
11.01.2017Search fee paid 
11.01.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
11.01.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.01.2017Examination requested  [2017/16]
11.01.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
10.07.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
27.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
29.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[YD]CN102584945  (SHENZHEN HYBIO PHARMACEUTICAL) [YD] 1-16 *see embodiment 17*;; claims 9,10 *;
 [T]CN104844694  (SHENZHEN HYBIO PHARMACEUTICAL) [T] 1-16 * the whole document *
 [XY]  - FRIEDEMANN HORN ET AL, "Intracellular responses to Gonadotropin-releasing hormone in a clonal cell line of the gonadotrope lineage", MOLECULAR ENDOCRINOLOGY, THE ENDOCRINE SOCIETY, US, (19910101), vol. 5, no. 3, doi:10.1210/MEND-5-3-347, ISSN 0888-8809, pages 347 - 355, XP002361664 [X] 1 * see compound with CAS RN 134365-99-4* [Y] 1-16

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1210/mend-5-3-347
 [A]  - THOMAS BECKERS ET AL, "Structure-Function Studies of Linear and Cyclized Peptide Antagonists of the GnRH Receptor", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20011201), vol. 289, no. 3, doi:10.1006/bbrc.2001.5939, ISSN 0006-291X, pages 653 - 663, XP055430702 [A] 1-16 * page 654, column 2, paragraph 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/bbrc.2001.5939
International search[Y]CN102584945  (SHENZHEN HYBIO PHARMACEUTICAL) [Y] 2-16 * , claims 1-10, and description, paragraph [0076] *;
 [PX]CN104231055  (SHENZHEN HYBIO PHARMACEUTICAL) [PX] 1-16 * , claims 1-16 *;
 [A]US5767082  (NESTOR JR JOHN J [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * , the whole document *;
 [A]US5212288  (NESTOR JR JOHN J [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * , the whole document *;
 [A]EP0301850  (SYNTEX INC [US]) [A] 1-16 * , the whole document *;
 [A]EP0443532  (SYNTEX INC [US]) [A] 1-16 * , the whole document *;
 [A]CN1348462  (ZANTARIS AG [DE]) [A] 1-16 * , the whole document *
 [XY]  - HORN, F. et al., "Intracellular Responses to Gonadotropin-Releasing Hormone in a Clonal Cell Line of the Gonadotrope Lineage", MOLECULAR ENDOCRINOLOGY, (19910331), vol. 5, no. 3, ISSN 0888-8809, pages 347 - 355, XP002361664 [X] 1 * . and table 2, and table 2 * [Y] 2-16

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1210/mend-5-3-347