Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3156413


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
11.07.2019 Change - representative
04.05.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
13.07.2018 Amendment by applicant
30.06.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
13.12.2017 Supplementary search report published on  10.01.2018  [2018/02]
08.12.2017 Change - classification published on  10.01.2018  [2018/02]
08.12.2017 Change - classification published on  10.01.2018  [2018/02]
18.08.2017 Change: Validation states published on  20.09.2017  [2017/38]
18.08.2017 Change - extension states published on  20.09.2017  [2017/38]
19.05.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
20.03.2017 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  19.04.2017  [2017/16]
20.03.2017 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
20.03.2017 Request for examination filed published on  19.04.2017  [2017/16]
24.02.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
10.02.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
20.01.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
18.01.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
11.01.2017 Change - representative
11.01.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
18.12.2015 PCT data prior to European publication