Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP3156452 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3156452



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 2522
27.12.2023 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
21.12.2023 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 30
21.12.2023 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 2
21.12.2023 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 2
15.11.2023 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
15.11.2023 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
15.11.2023 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 5
13.10.2023 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.10.2023 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
09.10.2023 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
09.10.2023 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
05.10.2023 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
29.09.2023 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
29.09.2023 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 6
29.09.2023 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 3
29.09.2023 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
29.09.2023 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
11.09.2023 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 34
11.09.2023 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 34
03.04.2023 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 1
03.04.2023 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 1
03.04.2023 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
29.03.2023 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
29.03.2023 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
29.03.2023 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
07.03.2023 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
02.03.2023 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
02.03.2023 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
02.03.2023 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
23.02.2023 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 2
23.02.2023 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 2
23.02.2023 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.02.2023 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
17.02.2023 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
17.02.2023 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 12
16.12.2022 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
16.12.2022 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.12.2022 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 3
14.12.2022 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 3
09.12.2022 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
08.12.2022 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
08.12.2022 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
08.12.2022 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
08.12.2022 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
08.12.2022 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
08.12.2022 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
08.12.2022 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
08.12.2022 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
08.12.2022 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 09 Appeal 4
08.12.2022 Claims Appeal 4
08.12.2022 Claims Appeal 4
08.12.2022 Claims Appeal 3
08.12.2022 Claims Appeal 4
08.12.2022 Claims Appeal 4
08.12.2022 Claims Appeal 4
08.12.2022 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
08.12.2022 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 24
07.12.2022 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
29.04.2022 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
25.04.2022 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
25.04.2022 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
25.04.2022 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 31
25.11.2021 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
22.11.2021 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
16.11.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
16.11.2021 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
16.11.2021 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
16.11.2021 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
16.11.2021 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
16.11.2021 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
16.11.2021 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
16.11.2021 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
16.11.2021 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
16.11.2021 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
16.11.2021 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
16.11.2021 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
16.11.2021 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
16.11.2021 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
16.11.2021 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
16.11.2021 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
16.11.2021 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
16.11.2021 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
16.11.2021 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
16.11.2021 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
16.11.2021 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
16.11.2021 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 01 Appeal 4
16.11.2021 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 02 Appeal 5
16.11.2021 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 03 Appeal 4
16.11.2021 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 03 Appeal 4
16.11.2021 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 03 Appeal 4
16.11.2021 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 04 Appeal 4
16.11.2021 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 04 Appeal 4
16.11.2021 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 04 Appeal 4
16.11.2021 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 05 Appeal 4
16.11.2021 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 05 Appeal 4
16.11.2021 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 05 Appeal 4
16.11.2021 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 06 Appeal 4
16.11.2021 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 06 Appeal 4
16.11.2021 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 06 Appeal 3
16.11.2021 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 07 Appeal 3
16.11.2021 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 08 Appeal 4
16.11.2021 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 08 Appeal 4
16.11.2021 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 08 Appeal 4
16.11.2021 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 08 Appeal 4
16.11.2021 Claims Appeal 4
16.11.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
16.11.2021 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
16.11.2021 Reply to appeal Appeal 47
06.07.2021 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
01.07.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
01.07.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
01.07.2021 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
01.07.2021 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 84
01.07.2021 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
01.07.2021 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
01.07.2021 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 15
01.07.2021 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
01.07.2021 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 32
01.07.2021 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 28
01.07.2021 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
01.07.2021 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
01.07.2021 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 86
01.07.2021 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
01.07.2021 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 24
01.07.2021 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
01.07.2021 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 36
01.07.2021 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 16
01.07.2021 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 28
20.05.2021 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
20.05.2021 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
12.05.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
12.05.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 4
12.05.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
12.05.2021 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
04.03.2021 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
03.03.2021 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
02.03.2021 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 7
02.03.2021 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
02.03.2021 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 27
02.03.2021 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 23
02.03.2021 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
02.03.2021 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
02.03.2021 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
02.03.2021 Means of redress Opposition 2
02.03.2021 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
02.03.2021 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
02.03.2021 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
02.03.2021 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
02.03.2021 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 4
02.03.2021 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 23
02.03.2021 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 4
02.03.2021 Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition Opposition 97
02.03.2021 Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition Opposition 97
22.01.2021 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 48
20.01.2021 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 5
19.01.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
19.01.2021 Amended description with annotations Opposition 23
19.01.2021 Description Opposition 23
19.01.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
19.01.2021 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
15.01.2021 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 6
11.01.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
11.01.2021 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 4
11.01.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
11.01.2021 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
01.12.2020 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 8
27.11.2020 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 3
27.11.2020 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 3
26.11.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
26.11.2020 Citation in opposition procedure - 012 Opposition 2
26.11.2020 Consolidated list of cited opposition documents Opposition 1
26.11.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
26.11.2020 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 7
19.11.2020 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 48
13.11.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
13.11.2020 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 4
13.11.2020 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 4
13.11.2020 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 4
13.11.2020 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 4
13.11.2020 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 03 Opposition 6
13.11.2020 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 04 Opposition 5
13.11.2020 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 05 Opposition 6
13.11.2020 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 06 Opposition 4
13.11.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
13.11.2020 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 10
06.11.2020 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
03.11.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
03.11.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
03.11.2020 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
26.08.2020 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 23
19.08.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
19.08.2020 Citation in opposition procedure - 011 Opposition 7
19.08.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
19.08.2020 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 15
15.06.2020 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
12.06.2020 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.06.2020 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 12
08.06.2020 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 12
08.06.2020 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 7
08.06.2020 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
08.06.2020 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
08.06.2020 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
21.04.2020 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 13
16.04.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
16.04.2020 Citation in opposition procedure - 002 Opposition 1
16.04.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
16.04.2020 Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor Opposition 11
20.03.2020 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 45
13.03.2020 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 4
13.03.2020 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
13.03.2020 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 4
13.03.2020 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 4
13.03.2020 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 4
13.03.2020 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 01 Opposition 2
13.03.2020 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 02 Opposition 2
13.03.2020 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 03 Opposition 2
13.03.2020 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 04 Opposition 2
13.03.2020 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 05 Opposition 3
13.03.2020 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 14
06.11.2019 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
06.11.2019 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 2
29.10.2019 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 178
22.10.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
22.10.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 001 Opposition 8
22.10.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 002 Opposition 6
22.10.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 003 Opposition 24
22.10.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 004 Opposition 36
22.10.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 005 Opposition 86
22.10.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 006 Opposition 16
22.10.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 007 Opposition 7
22.10.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 008 Opposition 8
22.10.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 009 Opposition 32
22.10.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 010 Opposition 84
22.10.2019 Notice of opposition Opposition 42
22.10.2019 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
04.02.2019 Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC Search / examination 1
07.01.2019 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
12.12.2018 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
03.12.2018 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
22.11.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
22.11.2018 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
22.11.2018 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
22.11.2018 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
22.11.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
08.11.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
08.11.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
08.11.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
08.11.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
08.11.2018 Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) Search / examination 6
08.11.2018 Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) Search / examination 7
16.07.2018 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
16.07.2018 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
16.07.2018 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
16.07.2018 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 57
16.07.2018 Text intended for grant (version for approval) Search / examination 57
18.06.2018 Examination started Search / examination 1
13.02.2018 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
13.02.2018 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
13.02.2018 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
08.01.2018 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
20.12.2017 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
20.12.2017 European search opinion Search / examination 2
20.12.2017 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
20.12.2017 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
04.12.2017 Search started Search / examination 1
22.03.2017 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
31.01.2017 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
27.01.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
10.01.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
10.01.2017 Abstract Search / examination 1
10.01.2017 Claims Search / examination 4
10.01.2017 Description Search / examination 53
10.01.2017 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
02.01.2017 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 4
02.01.2017 Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 5
21.10.2016 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
06.01.2016 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 29
17.12.2015 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
17.12.2015 Copy of the translated international search report Search / examination 2
17.12.2015 International publication pamphlet Search / examination 38