Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3221151

EP3221151 - CONTAINER-TREATING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR TREATING CONTAINERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2017/39]CONTAINER PROCESSING INSTALLATION AND A METHOD FOR PROCESSING CONTAINERS
[2018/14]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.07.2019
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  17.08.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  29.05.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  18.05.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  28.03.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  25.08.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  15.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE, SI
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Krones AG
Böhmerwaldstraße 5
93073 Neutraubling / DE
[2017/39]
Inventor(s)01 / GUT, Thorsten
Böhmerwaldstraße 5
93073 Neutraubling / DE
 [2017/39]
Representative(s)Schuhbießer, Irmgard Gertrud
Schuhbießer-Patent
Holzgartenstraße 6
93059 Regensburg / DE
[2017/39]
Application number, filing date15807824.620.11.2015
[2017/39]
WO2015EP77187
Priority number, dateDE20141011698720.11.2014         Original published format: DE102014116987
[2017/39]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016079283
Date:26.05.2016
Language:DE
[2016/21]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3221151
Date:27.09.2017
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.2016
[2017/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3221151
Date:19.09.2018
Language:DE
[2018/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.05.2016
ClassificationInternational:B41J3/407, B41J11/00
[2017/39]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/39]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:BEHÄLTERBEHANDLUNGSANLAGE UND VERFAHREN ZUM BEHANDELN VON BEHÄLTERN[2017/39]
English:CONTAINER-TREATING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR TREATING CONTAINERS[2018/14]
French:APPAREIL POUR LE TRAITEMENT DES RÉCIPIENTS ET MÉTHODE POUR LE TRAITEMENT DES RÉCIPIENTS[2018/14]
Former [2017/39]CONTAINER PROCESSING INSTALLATION AND A METHOD FOR PROCESSING CONTAINERS
Former [2017/39]SYSTÈME DE TRAITEMENT DE RÉCIPIENTS ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE RÉCIPIENTS
Entry into regional phase11.04.2017National basic fee paid 
11.04.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
11.04.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.03.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
11.04.2017Examination requested  [2017/39]
22.09.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.03.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.05.2018Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
23.05.2018Fee for grant paid
23.05.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
06.06.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.08.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)20.06.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL19.09.2018
CZ19.09.2018
DK19.09.2018
EE19.09.2018
ES19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
MC19.09.2018
NL19.09.2018
PL19.09.2018
RO19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
SI19.09.2018
SK19.09.2018
SM19.09.2018
IE20.11.2018
LU20.11.2018
BE30.11.2018
CH30.11.2018
LI30.11.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
IS19.01.2019
PT19.01.2019
[2019/50]
Former [2019/48]AL19.09.2018
CZ19.09.2018
DK19.09.2018
EE19.09.2018
ES19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
MC19.09.2018
NL19.09.2018
PL19.09.2018
RO19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
SK19.09.2018
SM19.09.2018
IE20.11.2018
LU20.11.2018
CH30.11.2018
LI30.11.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
IS19.01.2019
PT19.01.2019
Former [2019/40]AL19.09.2018
CZ19.09.2018
DK19.09.2018
EE19.09.2018
ES19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
MC19.09.2018
NL19.09.2018
PL19.09.2018
RO19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
SK19.09.2018
SM19.09.2018
LU20.11.2018
CH30.11.2018
LI30.11.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
IS19.01.2019
PT19.01.2019
Former [2019/35]AL19.09.2018
CZ19.09.2018
DK19.09.2018
EE19.09.2018
ES19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
MC19.09.2018
NL19.09.2018
PL19.09.2018
RO19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
SK19.09.2018
SM19.09.2018
LU20.11.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
IS19.01.2019
PT19.01.2019
Former [2019/34]AL19.09.2018
CZ19.09.2018
DK19.09.2018
EE19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
MC19.09.2018
NL19.09.2018
PL19.09.2018
RO19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
SK19.09.2018
SM19.09.2018
LU20.11.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
IS19.01.2019
PT19.01.2019
Former [2019/33]AL19.09.2018
CZ19.09.2018
EE19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
MC19.09.2018
NL19.09.2018
PL19.09.2018
RO19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
SK19.09.2018
SM19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
IS19.01.2019
PT19.01.2019
Former [2019/26]AL19.09.2018
CZ19.09.2018
EE19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
NL19.09.2018
PL19.09.2018
RO19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
SK19.09.2018
SM19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
IS19.01.2019
PT19.01.2019
Former [2019/24]AL19.09.2018
CZ19.09.2018
EE19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
NL19.09.2018
PL19.09.2018
RO19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
SK19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
IS19.01.2019
Former [2019/22]AL19.09.2018
CZ19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
NL19.09.2018
PL19.09.2018
RO19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
IS19.01.2019
Former [2019/21]AL19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
NL19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
IS19.01.2019
Former [2019/20]AL19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
NL19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
Former [2019/12]AL19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
Former [2019/11]FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
Former [2019/10]FI19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
Former [2019/08]FI19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
NO19.12.2018
Former [2019/07]LT19.09.2018
Cited inInternational search[A]DE102013208061  (KRONES AG [DE]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0001]; claim 1 * * paragraphs [0005] , [0 14] *;
 [A]EP1806233  (KHS AG [DE]) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0012] - [0020] * * claims 1, 23 *