blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3224133


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
26.07.2019 Change - classification published on  28.08.2019 [2019/35]
26.07.2019 Change - classification published on  28.08.2019 [2019/35]
20.05.2019 New entry: Reply to examination report
19.03.2019 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
03.12.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
16.11.2018 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
09.11.2018 First examination report
10.07.2018 Change - representative
26.01.2018 Change: Validation states published on  28.02.2018  [2018/09]
26.01.2018 Change - extension states published on  28.02.2018  [2018/09]
27.10.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
01.09.2017 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  04.10.2017  [2017/40]
01.09.2017 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible has been established
01.09.2017 Request for examination filed published on  04.10.2017  [2017/40]
25.08.2017 Change - representative
25.08.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
07.08.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
19.07.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
07.07.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
30.06.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
22.07.2016 PCT data prior to European publication
11.06.2016 PCT data prior to European publication
03.06.2016 PCT data prior to European publication
21.12.2015 PCT data prior to European publication