blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP3224133
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2017355258Global Dossier 14.12.2017A1
Priority number Date
WO2015GB00318 24.11.2015
GB201420899 25.11.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3224133Global Dossier 04.10.2017A2
Priority number Date
WO2015GB00318 24.11.2015
GB201420899 25.11.2014
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2016083770Global Dossier 21.07.2016A3
WO2016083770 02.06.2016A2
Priority number Date
GB201420899 25.11.2014
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
GB2532731 01.06.2016A
GB201420899D 07.01.2015D0
Priority number Date
GB201420899 25.11.2014