Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3224133

EP3224133 - HYBRID POWER SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  09.11.2018
Database last updated on 20.08.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  01.09.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  30.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip26.07.2019Change - classificationpublished on 28.08.2019 [2019/35]
26.07.2019Change - classificationpublished on 28.08.2019 [2019/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hawksley, Graeme Eric
11 Melville Street
Sandown
Isle of Wight PO36 8LF / GB
[2017/40]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2017/40]
Representative(s)Stanley, David William
Stanleys
Intellectual Property
Parkshot House
5 Kew Road
Richmond, TW9 2PR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2017/40]Bason, Charlie
Venture Proof Limited
Crest House
102-104 Church Road
Teddington, Middlesex TW11 8PY / GB
Application number, filing date15807965.724.11.2015
[2017/40]
WO2015GB00318
Priority number, dateGB2014002089925.11.2014         Original published format: GB 201420899
[2017/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2016083770
Date:02.06.2016
Language:EN
[2016/22]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP3224133
Date:04.10.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.06.2016
[2017/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.07.2016
ClassificationInternational:B63J3/02
[2019/35]
Former International [2017/40]B63H21/20, B63H23/12, B63H23/18
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/40]
TitleGerman:HYBRIDANTRIEBSSYSTEM[2017/40]
English:HYBRID POWER SYSTEM[2017/40]
French:SYSTÈME D'ALIMENTATION HYBRIDE[2017/40]
Entry into regional phase26.06.2017National basic fee paid 
26.06.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
26.06.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.06.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
26.06.2017Examination requested  [2017/40]
07.11.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.05.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
29.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[A]SU380531  (RUDENKO EP, DERZHAVETS YF) [A] 1-8 * figure 2 *;
 [A]GB2514183  (PERKINS ENGINES CO LTD [GB]) [A] 1 * figure 3 *;
 [A]WO0104477  (BORIC MIROSLAV [HR]) [A] 1 * figure 1 *;
 [A]SU463587  (RUDENKO EP) [A] 1 * figure . *;
 [A]SU385826  (RUDENKO EP) [A] 1 * figure . *