EP3224267 - PHOSPHINIC VANADIUM COMPLEX, CATALYTIC SYSTEM COMPRISING SAID PHOSPHINIC VANADIUM COMPLEX AND PROCESS FOR THE (CO) POLYMERIZATION OF CONJUGATED DIENES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.12.2021 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.01.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.09.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.04.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Versalis S.p.A. Piazza Boldrini 1 20097 San Donato Milanese (MI) / IT | [2021/08] |
Former [2017/40] | For all designated states Versalis S.p.A. Piazza Boldrini 1 20097 San Donato Milanese (MI) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RICCI, Giovanni Via E. Sartori 11/1 43126 Parma / IT | 02 /
LEONE, Giuseppe Via Cesare Saldini 38 20133 Milano / IT | 03 /
SOMMAZZI, Anna Piazza Mazzini 10 16038 Santa Margherita Ligure (GE) / IT | 04 /
FORNI, Alessandra Via Aldo Moro 14 20066 Melzo (MI) / IT | 05 /
MASI, Francesco Via Galvani 7 26866 S. Angelo Lodigiano (LO) / IT | [2021/08] |
Former [2017/40] | 01 /
RICCI, Giovanni Via E. Sartori 11/1 I - 43126 Parma / IT | ||
02 /
LEONE, Giuseppe Via Cesare Saldini 38 I - 20133 Milano / IT | |||
03 /
SOMMAZZI, Anna Piazza Mazzini 10 I - 16038 Santa Margherita Ligure (GE) / IT | |||
04 /
FORNI, Alessandra Via Aldo Moro 14 I - 20066 Melzo (MI) / IT | |||
05 /
MASI, Francesco Via Galvani 7 I - 26866 S. Angelo Lodigiano (LO) / IT | Representative(s) | Cernuzzi, Daniele, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [2021/08] |
Former [2017/40] | Mauro, Marina Eliana Murgitroyd & Company Piazza Borromeo, 12 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 15808268.5 | 24.11.2015 | [2017/40] | WO2015IB59072 | Priority number, date | IT2014MI02028 | 25.11.2014 Original published format: IT MI20142028 | [2017/40] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016128812 | Date: | 18.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3224267 | Date: | 04.10.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.08.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3224267 | Date: | 24.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.08.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C07F9/50, C08F4/20, C08F4/68, C08F10/00, C08F136/06, C07F9/46 | [2020/41] | CPC: |
C07F9/5045 (EP,CN,RU,US);
C07F19/00 (KR);
C07F9/46 (EP,RU,US);
C07F9/6596 (CN);
C08F10/00 (US);
C08F10/06 (US);
C08F10/08 (US);
C08F136/06 (EP,CN,US);
C08F136/08 (CN);
C08F2/38 (KR);
C08F2/60 (KR);
C08F36/00 (RU);
C08F36/04 (KR);
C08F36/06 (RU);
C08F36/08 (RU);
C08F4/14 (KR);
C08F4/20 (RU,US);
C08F4/68 (RU,US);
| C-Set: |
C08F136/06, C08F4/20 (CN);
C08F136/06, C08F4/68086 (EP,CN,US);
C08F136/08, C08F4/20 (CN);
C08F136/08, C08F4/68086 (CN) |
Former IPC [2017/40] | C07F9/50, C08F4/20, C08F4/68, C08F10/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PHOSPHINISCHER VANADIUMKOMPLEX, KATALYSATORSYSTEM MIT DIESEM PHOSPHINISCHEN VANADIUMKOMPLEX UND VERFAHREN ZUR (CO)POLYMERISATION VON KONJUGIERTEN DIENEN | [2017/40] | English: | PHOSPHINIC VANADIUM COMPLEX, CATALYTIC SYSTEM COMPRISING SAID PHOSPHINIC VANADIUM COMPLEX AND PROCESS FOR THE (CO) POLYMERIZATION OF CONJUGATED DIENES | [2017/40] | French: | COMPLEXE DE VANADIUM PHOSPHINIQUE, SYSTÈME CATALYTIQUE COMPRENANT LEDIT COMPLEXE DE VANADIUM PHOSPHINIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE (CO)POLYMÉRISATION DE DIÈNES CONJUGUÉS | [2017/40] | Entry into regional phase | 14.06.2017 | National basic fee paid | 14.06.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.06.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.06.2017 | Examination requested [2017/40] | 14.06.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.01.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 18.01.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.01.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 25.11.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2019 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   09.01.2020 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 24.02.2021 | AT | 24.02.2021 | CY | 24.02.2021 | DK | 24.02.2021 | EE | 24.02.2021 | HR | 24.02.2021 | LT | 24.02.2021 | LV | 24.02.2021 | MC | 24.02.2021 | SE | 24.02.2021 | SI | 24.02.2021 | SM | 24.02.2021 | BG | 24.05.2021 | NO | 24.05.2021 | GR | 25.05.2021 | IS | 24.06.2021 | IE | 24.11.2021 | [2023/30] |
Former [2022/48] | AL | 24.02.2021 | |
AT | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
MC | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SI | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
IE | 24.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 24.02.2021 | |
AT | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
MC | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SI | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 24.02.2021 | |
AT | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SI | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/13] | AL | 24.02.2021 | |
AT | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SI | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 24.02.2021 | |
AT | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 24.02.2021 | |
AT | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 24.02.2021 | |
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 24.02.2021 | |
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 24.02.2021 | |
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | HR | 24.02.2021 | |
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/38] | HR | 24.02.2021 | |
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | HR | 24.02.2021 | |
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | HR | 24.02.2021 | |
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | HR | 24.02.2021 | |
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | LT | 24.02.2021 | |
NO | 24.05.2021 | Cited in | International search | [XI]EP2039677 (SHANGHAI INST ORGANIC CHEM [CN]) [X] 1,2 * claims 5-7 * [I] 3-6; | [X] - David G L Holt ET AL, "Synthesis and structural studies of complexes of vanadium(I1) and vanadium(II1) halides with tertiary phosphines", Inorganica Chirnica Acta, (19930101), pages 11 - 19, URL: http://www.sciencedirect.com/science/article/pii/S0020169300914506/pdf?md5=f48283cf4316b5f51be90ff0f05efc09&pid=1-s2.0-S0020169300914506-main.pdf, (20150715), XP055202568 [X] 1,2 * page 16, column 2, line 32 - page 17, column 1, line 28 * | [X] - J Nieman ET AL, "Preparation and characterization of mono-cyclopentadienylvanadium dihalide bis-phosphine complexes; crystal structure of ([eta]5-C5H5)VCL2(PMe3)2", Journal of Organometallic Chemistry, doi:10.1016/0022-328X(83)87022-3, (19831001), pages 193 - 204, URL: http://www.sciencedirect.com/science/article/pii/0022328X83870223/pdf?md5=58a420156a8ffd0ce94b5242668def3f&pid=1-s2.0-0022328X83870223-main.pdf, XP055202519 [X] 1,2 * page 202, lines 19-40 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-328X(83)87022-3 | [X] - BRADLEY S ET AL, "SYNTHESIS AND STRUCTURE OF AMINO-FUNCTIONALIZED CYCLOPENTADIENYL VANADIUM COMPLEXES AND EVALUATION OF THEIR BUTADIENE POLYMERIZATION BEHAVIOR", ORGANOMETALLICS, ACS, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (20020101), vol. 21, no. 6, doi:10.1021/OM020170F, ISSN 0276-7333, pages 3443 - 3453, XP001189047 [X] 1,2 * page 3453, column 1, lines 3-51 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/om020170f | [X] - ANN R. HERMES ET AL, "Phosphine complexes of trivalent early transition metals. X-ray crystal structure of the d1-d1 (1,2-bis(diisopropylphosphino)ethane)trichlorotitanium dimer and synthesis of the alkyl (1,2-bis(diisopropylphosphino)ethane)dichloro(methyl)(THF)chromium", INORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (19900101), vol. 29, no. 2, doi:10.1021/ic00327a032, ISSN 0020-1669, pages 313 - 317, XP055202760 [X] 1,2 * page 316, column 2, line 50 - page 317, column 1, line 16; compounds 3, 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ic00327a032 | [X] - Wenerios Tsagkalidis ET AL, "Hydrazine complexes of vanadium(I1 and III)", Inorganica Chimica Acta, (19930101), pages 239 - 243, URL: http://www.sciencedirect.com/science/article/pii/S0020169300855449/pdf?md5=5bf2db703c14691f2faa2aeb047242e8&pid=1-s2.0-S0020169300855449-main.pdf, XP055202739 [X] 1,2 * page 240, column 2, lines 17-24; compound 8 * | [X] - A. HILLS ET ALIA, "Compounds with Vanadium-Nitrogen and Vanadium-Oxygen multiple bonds", J. CHEM. SOC. DALTON TRANSACTIONS, (1993), pages 3609 - 3617, XP002742357 [X] 1,2 * page 3614, column 2, lines 1-37 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/DT9930003609 | [X] - K. ISSLEIB ET AL, "Beitr�ge zur Komplexchemie terti�rer Phosphine und Phosphinoxyde. IV. Phosphin- und Phosphinoxydkomplexe des 3wertigen Vanadins", ZEITSCHRIFT F�R ANORGANISCHE UND ALLGEMEINE CHEMIE, (19590901), vol. 301, no. 3-4, doi:10.1002/zaac.19593010308, ISSN 0044-2313, pages 188 - 196, XP055202532 [X] 1,2 * abstract * * page 190, lines 1-41 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/zaac.19593010308 | [AD] - RICCI G ET AL, "Polymerization of 1,3-dienes with catalysts based on mono- and bis-cyclopentadienyl derivatives of vanadium", POLYMER, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V, GB, (19960101), vol. 37, no. 2, doi:10.1016/0032-3861(96)81112-8, ISSN 0032-3861, pages 363 - 365, XP004065489 [AD] 1-6 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0032-3861(96)81112-8 | Examination | - Zhongbao Jian ET AL, "Rare-earth metal bis(alkyl)s that bear a 2-pyridinemethanamine ligand: Dual catalysis of the polymerizations of both isoprene and ethylene", Dalton Transactions, (20120101), vol. 41, no. 8, doi:10.1039/c1dt11890k, ISSN 1477-9226, page 2367, XP055575695 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/c1dt11890k |