Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3234773

EP3234773 - METHOD FOR SCHEDULING AN AUDIO TREATMENT OF A MOTOR VEHICLE, AND ASSOCIATED OPERATING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  21.06.2019
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  11.02.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.09.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip21.06.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 24.07.2019 [2019/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Arkamys
31 rue Pouchet
75017 Paris / FR
[2017/43]
Inventor(s)01 / BOURMEYSTER, Yvan
34 rue La Quintini
75015 Paris / FR
 [2017/43]
Representative(s)Ipside
7-9 Allées Haussmann
33300 Bordeaux Cedex / FR
[2017/43]
Application number, filing date15808587.811.12.2015
[2017/43]
WO2015EP79439
Priority number, dateFR2014006254416.12.2014         Original published format: FR 1462544
[2017/43]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016096656
Date:23.06.2016
Language:FR
[2016/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3234773
Date:25.10.2017
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.2016
[2017/43]
Type: B1  Patent specification
No.:EP3234773
Date:24.07.2019
Language:FR
[2019/30]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.06.2016
ClassificationInternational:G06F9/48
[2017/43]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/43]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR PLANUNG EINER AUDIOBEHANDLUNG EINES KRAFTFAHRZEUGS UND ZUGEHÖRIGES BETRIEBSSYSTEM[2017/43]
English:METHOD FOR SCHEDULING AN AUDIO TREATMENT OF A MOTOR VEHICLE, AND ASSOCIATED OPERATING SYSTEM[2017/43]
French:PROCEDE D'ORDONNANCEMENT D'UN TRAITEMENT AUDIO D'UN VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE ET SYSTEME D'EXPLOITATION ASSOCIE[2017/43]
Entry into regional phase15.06.2017National basic fee paid 
15.06.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
15.06.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.06.2017Examination requested  [2017/43]
15.06.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
29.01.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.02.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.06.2019Fee for grant paid
07.06.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
07.06.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
31.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[I]US6594773  (LISITSA RAFAEL S [US], et al) [I] 1-7 * column 3, line 30 - line 38 * * column 7, line 50 - column 8, line 3 *;
 [A]US6086628  (DAVE BHARAT P [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *;
 [A]  - GEILEN M ET AL, "Worst-case performance analysis of Synchronous Dataflow scenarios", 2010 IEEE/ACM/IFIP INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON HARDWARE/SOFTWARE CODESIGN AND SYSTEM SYNTHESIS (CODES+ISSS) IEEE PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (2010), ISBN 978-1-60558-905-3, pages 125 - 134, XP002751095 [A] 1-7 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1878961.1878985