Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3224423

EP3224423 - THERMAL INSULATION SYSTEM AND KIT AND METHOD FOR INSTALLING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  07.11.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  23.10.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  20.06.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  01.09.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  02.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.03.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 17.04.2019  [2019/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Saint-Gobain Isover
18 Avenue d'Alsace
92400 Courbevoie / FR
[2017/40]
Inventor(s)01 / MORCRETTE, Alice
130 rue Vulfran Warne
80000 Amiens / FR
 [2017/40]
Representative(s)Saint-Gobain Recherche
B.P. 135
39, quai Lucien Lefranc
93303 Aubervilliers Cedex / FR
[2017/40]
Application number, filing date15808760.127.11.2015
[2017/40]
WO2015FR53248
Priority number, dateFR2014006167528.11.2014         Original published format: FR 1461675
[2017/40]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016083760
Date:02.06.2016
Language:FR
[2016/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3224423
Date:04.10.2017
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.06.2016
[2017/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3224423
Date:17.04.2019
Language:FR
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP02.06.2016
ClassificationInternational:E04B1/76, E04B1/80
[2017/40]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/40]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:WÄRMEISOLIERSYSTEM UND KIT SOWIE INSTALLATIONSVERFAHREN DAFÜR[2017/40]
English:THERMAL INSULATION SYSTEM AND KIT AND METHOD FOR INSTALLING SAME[2017/40]
French:KIT ET SYSTEME D'ISOLATION THERMIQUE ET PROCEDE POUR SON INSTALLATION[2017/40]
Entry into regional phase28.06.2017National basic fee paid 
28.06.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
28.06.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.06.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
28.06.2017Examination requested  [2017/40]
21.06.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.10.2018Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
15.11.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.03.2019Fee for grant paid
05.03.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
05.03.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[A]DE202004004187U  (POREXTHERM DAEMMSTOFFE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0003] , [0014] , [0 18] , [0 21] , [0022] * * figures 1-5 *;
 [A]WO2013086005  (DOW CORNING [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0002] - [0006] - [0059] , [0060] * * figures 1a,1b,5 *;
 [A]GB2477401  (KINGSPAN HOLDINGS [IE]) [A] 1-15 * page 7 * * figures 1-23 *;
 [A]EP1496167  (WANGLER NORBERT [AT], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP2468971  (NORPAC [FR]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0038] , [0041] , [0046] , [0047] , [0063] , [0065] * * claim 8 * * figures 5,8,10 *;
 [A]CH687932  (PAVAFIBRES S A FRIBOURG [CH]) [A] 1-15 * column 1, line 24 - column 2, line 25 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]FR1250228  (BÄHR, MME, NÉE SCHNADT, ELFRIEDE) [A] 1-15 * column 1, line 1 - line 4 * * column 1, line 28 - line 42 * * column 2, line 15 - line 35 * * figures 2,3 *;
 [A]EP0114687  (GRUENZWEIG HARTMANN GLASFASER [DE]) [A] 1-15 * page 9, line 35 - line 38 * * figures 1-3 *
by applicantFR2849461
 US2006265988
 WO2014128378