blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3163260

EP3163260 - SENSOR MODULE CAPABLE OF SETTING OPERATION STANDARD THROUGH PHYSICAL VALUE INPUT AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING SENSOR MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  09.08.2019
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  30.11.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  31.03.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  23.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kim, Jong Tae
301-302 12
Byeoryang-ro
Gwacheon-si, Gyeonggi-do 427-739 / KR
[2017/18]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2017/18]
Representative(s)Stolmár & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Blumenstraße 17
80331 München / DE
[2017/18]
Application number, filing date15811695.423.06.2015
[2017/18]
WO2015KR06334
Priority number, dateKR2014007823525.06.2014         Original published format: KR 20140078235
[2017/18]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2015199401
Date:30.12.2015
Language:KO
[2015/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3163260
Date:03.05.2017
Language:EN
[2017/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR30.12.2015
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.01.2018
ClassificationIPC:G01D21/00, G01D5/00
[2017/18]
CPC:
G01D5/00 (EP); G01D21/00 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/18]
TitleGerman:SENSORMODUL ZUR EINSTELLUNG VON OPERATIONSSTANDARDS DURCH EINGABE PHYSIKALISCHER WERTE UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG DES SENSORMODULS[2017/18]
English:SENSOR MODULE CAPABLE OF SETTING OPERATION STANDARD THROUGH PHYSICAL VALUE INPUT AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING SENSOR MODULE[2017/18]
French:MODULE DE CAPTEUR APTE À DÉFINIR UNE NORME DE FONCTIONNEMENT PAR LE BIAIS D'UNE SAISIE DE VALEUR PHYSIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DU MODULE DE CAPTEUR[2017/18]
Entry into regional phase23.12.2016Translation filed 
23.12.2016National basic fee paid 
23.12.2016Search fee paid 
23.12.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
23.12.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.12.2016Examination requested  [2017/18]
23.12.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
09.07.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.11.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.04.2019Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/37]
08.05.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2019/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
30.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.201905   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]DE19729404  (SIEMENS AG [DE]);
 [X]US2005060905  (NOVAK JANEZ [SI], et al)
International search[A]KR100790462B  (KD POWER CO LTD [KR], et al) [A] 1-3 * See the entire document *;
 [A]KR100531320B  (LG ELECTRONICS INC.) [A] 1-3 * See the entire document *;
 [A]KR100959155B  (NAUTILUS HYOSUNG INC.) [A] 1-3 * See the entire document *;
 [A]KR20120087444  (HALLA CLIMATE CONTROL CORP [KR]) [A] 1-3 * See the entire document *
ExaminationDE602005001115T
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.