Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3231252

EP3231252 - DEICING OF STRUCTURES USING MICROWAWES GENERATED BY TRANSISTORS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  02.11.2018
Database last updated on 15.01.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  20.06.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.09.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  15.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip02.11.2018(Expected) grantpublished on 05.12.2018  [2018/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Icesolution AS
Öraveien 15 B
1630 Gamle Fredrikstad / NO
[2017/42]
Inventor(s)01 / KARTHÄUSER, Joachim
Blockvägen 14 B
192 51 Sollentuna / SE
 [2017/42]
Representative(s)Ehrner & Delmar Patentbyrå AB
Drottninggatan 33, plan 4
111 51 Stockholm / SE
[2017/42]
Application number, filing date15812994.008.12.2015
[2017/42]
WO2015EP78990
Priority number, dateSE2014000058210.12.2014         Original published format: SE 1400582
SE2015000003823.01.2015         Original published format: SE 1500038
[2017/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016091882
Date:16.06.2016
Language:EN
[2016/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3231252
Date:18.10.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.06.2016
[2017/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3231252
Date:05.12.2018
Language:EN
[2018/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP16.06.2016
ClassificationInternational:H05B6/64, B64D15/00, H05B6/68, H05B6/80
[2017/42]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/42]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ENTEISUNG VON STRUKTUREN MIT DURCH TRANSISTOREN ERZEUGTEN MIKROWELLEN[2017/42]
English:DEICING OF STRUCTURES USING MICROWAWES GENERATED BY TRANSISTORS[2017/42]
French:DÉGIVRAGE DE STRUCTURES À L'AIDE D'HYPERFRÉQUENCES GÉNÉRÉES PAR DES TRANSISTORS[2017/42]
Entry into regional phase12.06.2017National basic fee paid 
12.06.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
12.06.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.06.2017Examination requested  [2017/42]
12.06.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
12.12.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.06.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.10.2018Fee for grant paid
16.10.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
16.10.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201703   M06   Fee paid on   21.05.2018
Cited inInternational search[AD]WO2013172762  (JKA KEMI AB [SE], et al) [AD] 1-12 * claims 1,5 *;
 [A]US5615849  (SALISBURY JONATHAN T [US]) [A] 1-12 * abstract *;
 [A]US2003015524  (FEHER LAMBERT [DE]) [A] 1-12 * abstract *;
 [A]US5061836  (MARTIN ANTHONY N [US]) [A] 1-12 * abstract *