Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3256815

EP3256815 - AUTONOMOUS NAVIGATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  13.07.2018
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  17.11.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  10.08.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.12.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Apple Inc.
One Apple Park Way
Cupertino CA 95014 / US
[2018/31]
Former [2017/51]For all designated states
Apple Inc.
1 Infinite Loop
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
Inventor(s)01 / AL-DAHLE, Ahmad
c/o Apple Inc.
1 Infinite Loop
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
02 / LAST, E., Matthew
c/o Apple Inc.
1 Infinite Loop
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
03 / SIEH, J., Philip
c/o Apple Inc.
1 Infinite Loop
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
04 / LYON, Benjamin
c/o Apple Inc.
1 Infinite Loop
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
 [2018/07]
Representative(s)Lang, Johannes
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
[2017/51]
Application number, filing date15813220.904.12.2015
[2017/51]
WO2015US64059
Priority number, dateUS201462088428P05.12.2014         Original published format: US 201462088428 P
[2017/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016090282
Date:09.06.2016
Language:EN
[2016/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3256815
Date:20.12.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.06.2016
[2017/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP09.06.2016
ClassificationInternational:G01C21/32
[2017/51]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/51]
TitleGerman:AUTONOMES NAVIGATIONSSYSTEM[2017/51]
English:AUTONOMOUS NAVIGATION SYSTEM[2017/51]
French:SYSTÈME DE NAVIGATION AUTONOME[2017/51]
Entry into regional phase18.10.2017National basic fee paid 
18.10.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
18.10.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDeletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/51]
22.09.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time  [2017/51]
18.10.2017Examination requested  [2017/51]
18.10.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
22.05.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.07.2018Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01)
26.07.2018Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments
Request for further processing for:18.10.2017Request for further processing filed
18.10.2017Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
09.11.2017Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee
18.10.2017Request for further processing filed
18.10.2017Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
09.11.2017Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee
18.10.2017Request for further processing filed
18.10.2017Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
09.11.2017Decision despatched
18.10.2017Request for further processing filed
18.10.2017Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
09.11.2017Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees
TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL
18.10.2017Request for further processing filed
18.10.2017Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
09.11.2017Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
12.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
13.12.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[Y]US2007198177  (YAMADA KAZUNAO [JP]) [Y] 1,7,11,15,16,20,21,27-29,32,35,37 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0055]; figures 1-4 *;
 [Y]WO2014139821  (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE], et al) [Y] 1,7,11,15,16,20,21,27-29,32,35,37 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0040]; figure 1 *