Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3230742

EP3230742 - METHOD FOR THE DETECTION OF HORMONE SENSITIVE DISEASE PROGRESSION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  29.06.2018
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.09.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  10.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.10.2018New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Belgian Volition SPRL
22 Rue Phocas Lejeune
5032 Isnes / BE
[2017/42]
Inventor(s)01 / MICALLEF, Jacob Vincent
c/o Belgian Volition SPRL
22 Rue Phocas Lejeune
BE - 5032 Isnes / BE
 [2017/42]
Representative(s)Aitken, Elizabeth Grace Catherine
Sagittarius IP
Three Globeside
Fieldhouse Lane
Marlow, Bucks. SL7 1HZ / GB
[2017/42]
Application number, filing date15813493.210.12.2015
[2017/42]
WO2015GB53776
Priority number, dateGB2014002193310.12.2014         Original published format: GB 201421933
[2017/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016092306
Date:16.06.2016
Language:EN
[2016/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3230742
Date:18.10.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.06.2016
[2017/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP16.06.2016
ClassificationInternational:G01N33/574, G01N33/68
[2017/42]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/42]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM NACHWEIS DER PROGRESSION VON HORMONSENSITIVEN ERKRANKUNGEN[2017/42]
English:METHOD FOR THE DETECTION OF HORMONE SENSITIVE DISEASE PROGRESSION[2017/42]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION DE PROGRESSION D'UNE MALADIE HORMONO-SENSIBLE[2017/42]
Entry into regional phase04.07.2017National basic fee paid 
04.07.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
04.07.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.07.2017Examination requested  [2017/42]
04.07.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
19.01.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.06.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.10.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201703   M06   Fee paid on   05.04.2018
Cited inInternational search[XY]WO2013084002  (SINGAPORE VOLITION PTE LTD [SG]) [X] 5-7 * page 24, line 29 - page 25, line 18; examples 1-12 * * page 11, line 13 - line 18 * [Y] 1-4,8-19;
 [Y]WO2014047285  (GIANNAKAKOU PARASKEVI [US], et al) [Y] 1-4,8-19 * claims 1-18 *;
 [A]WO2014131845  (SINGAPORE VOLITION PTE LTD [SG], et al) [A] 1-19 * page 13, line 19 - page 15, line 23 *;
 [Y]  - EMMANUEL S. ANTONARAKIS ET AL, "AR-V7 and Resistance to Enzalutamide and Abiraterone in Prostate Cancer", NEW ENGLAND JOURNAL OF MEDICINE, (20140911), vol. 371, no. 11, doi:10.1056/NEJMoa1315815, ISSN 0028-4793, pages 1028 - 1038, XP055203484 [Y] 1-4,8-19 * abstract * * page 1036, paragraph last - page 1037, paragraph 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1056/NEJMoa1315815
 [A]  - WILLIAM C. KRAUSE ET AL, "Androgen receptor and its splice variant, AR-V7, differentially regulate FOXA1 sensitive genes in LNCaP prostate cancer cells", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF BIOCHEMISTRY AND CELL BIOLOGY, GB, (20140901), vol. 54, doi:10.1016/j.biocel.2014.06.013, ISSN 1357-2725, pages 49 - 59, XP055248431 [A] 1-19 * page 5, paragraph 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.biocel.2014.06.013
 [A]  - C. LIU ET AL, "Niclosamide Inhibits Androgen Receptor Variants Expression and Overcomes Enzalutamide Resistance in Castration-Resistant Prostate Cancer", CLINICAL CANCER RESEARCH, US, (20140416), vol. 20, no. 12, doi:10.1158/1078-0432.CCR-13-3296, ISSN 1078-0432, pages 3198 - 3210, XP055248432 [A] 1-19 * page 3, paragraph 3 - page 4, paragraph 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/1078-0432.CCR-13-3296
 [Y]  - WINNIFRED BRYANT ET AL, "The Estrogen Receptor (ER)[alpha] Variant [Delta]5 Exhibits Dominant Positive Activity on ER-Regulated Promoters in Endometrial Carcinoma Cells", ENDOCRINOLOGY, US, (20050201), vol. 146, no. 2, doi:10.1210/en.2004-0825, ISSN 0013-7227, pages 751 - 759, XP055248708 [Y] 1-4,8-19 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1210/en.2004-0825
 [Y]  - MAIE AL-BADER, "Analysis of estrogen receptor isoforms and variants in breast cancer cell lines", EXPERIMENTAL AND THERAPEUTIC MEDICINE, GR, (20110310), doi:10.3892/etm.2011.226, ISSN 1792-0981, XP055248707 [Y] 1-4,8-19 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.3892/etm.2011.226
 [Y]  - C. ZHAO ET AL, "Estrogen Receptor 2 Negatively Regulates the Transactivation of Estrogen Receptor in Human Breast Cancer Cells", CANCER RESEARCH, US, (20070415), vol. 67, no. 8, doi:10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-06-3505, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 3955 - 3962, XP055248448 [Y] 1-4,8-19 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-06-3505
 [Y]  - LARS-ARNE HALDOSÉN ET AL, "Estrogen receptor beta in breast cancer", MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR ENDOCRINOLOGY., IE, (20140101), vol. 382, no. 1, doi:10.1016/j.mce.2013.08.005, ISSN 0303-7207, pages 665 - 672, XP055248232 [Y] 1-4,8-19 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.mce.2013.08.005
 [A]  - JOHN KALLOS ET AL, "Assessment of estrogen receptor-histone interactions (affinity chromatography/DNA-cellulose/protein-protein interactions/chromosomal proteins/steroid hormone action)", PNAS, (19810101), vol. 78, pages 2874 - 2878, XP055248161 [A] 1-19 * the whole document *
 [A]  - CHRISTOFOROS THOMAS ET AL, "The different roles of ER subtypes in cancer biology and therapy", NATURE REVIEWS. CANCER, GB, (20110722), vol. 11, no. 8, doi:10.1038/nrc3093, ISSN 1474-175X, pages 597 - 608, XP055248446 [A] 1-19 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nrc3093