Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3229674

EP3229674 - AUTOMATED IDENTIFICATION AND CLASSIFICATION OF INTRAVASCULAR LESIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  02.02.2018
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.09.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  07.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip03.12.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips N.V.
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
For all designated states
Volcano Corporation
3721 Valley Center Drive
Suite 500
San Diego, CA 92130 / US
[2017/42]
Inventor(s)01 / MERRITT, Fergus
c/o High Tech Campus
Building 5
NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
02 / TOCHTERMAN, Andrew
c/o High Tech Campus
Building 5
NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
03 / KELLER, Jacqueline
c/o High Tech Campus
Building 5
NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
 [2017/42]
Representative(s)Philips Intellectual Property & Standards
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2017/42]Steffen, Thomas
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date15813569.926.11.2015
[2017/42]
WO2015IB59135
Priority number, dateUS201462089090P08.12.2014         Original published format: US 201462089090 P
[2017/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016092403
Date:16.06.2016
Language:EN
[2016/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3229674
Date:18.10.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.06.2016
[2017/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP16.06.2016
ClassificationInternational:A61B5/0215, A61B5/02, A61B5/026, A61B1/313, A61B6/00, A61B6/12, A61B5/06, A61B5/00, A61B8/08
[2017/42]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/42]
TitleGerman:AUTOMATISIERTE IDENTIFIZIERUNG UND KLASSIFIZIERUNG VON INTRAVASKULÄREN LÄSIONEN[2017/42]
English:AUTOMATED IDENTIFICATION AND CLASSIFICATION OF INTRAVASCULAR LESIONS[2017/42]
French:IDENTIFICATION ET CLASSIFICATION AUTOMATISÉES DE LÉSIONS INTRAVASCULAIRES[2017/42]
Entry into regional phase10.07.2017National basic fee paid 
10.07.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
10.07.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.06.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.06.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
10.07.2017Examination requested  [2017/42]
31.01.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.05.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.10.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.01.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.05.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.09.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
02.12.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[X]US2014187920  (MILLETT BRET C [US] ET AL) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0007] , [0008] , [0033] - paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0049] * * paragraphs [0057] , [0059] , [0060] , [0063] , [0064] * * figures 3,4,9,10 *;
 [X]US2014236011  (FAN YING [US] ET AL) [X] 1,2,7-12 * paragraphs [0008] , [0010] , [0011] , [0021] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraphs [0026] , [0027] , [0028] , [0031] * * paragraphs [0042] , [0043] , [0065] , [0085] * * figures 1,3,4 *;
 [X]US2014039276  (HATTANGADI NEIL [US] ET AL) [X] 1,2,5-12 * paragraphs [0011] , [0012] , [0026] - paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraphs [0039] , [0053] , [0054] , [0059] , [0062] * * figures 1,2,4,7,8 *;
 [A]WO2014175853  (LIGHTLAB IMAGING INC [US]) [A] 3,4 * paragraphs [0016] , [0034] , [0035] * * claim 1 *
by applicantUS7930014
 WO2012093260
 WO2012093266
 WO2013028612
 WO2011IL00612
 WO2009IL01089
 US20080075244