Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3229674


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
14.02.2020 Change - applicant published on  18.03.2020 [2020/12]
03.12.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
21.10.2019 Change - representative
06.09.2019 New entry: Reply to examination report
22.05.2019 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
29.01.2019 New entry: Reply to examination report
04.12.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
19.10.2018 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
30.05.2018 New entry: Reply to examination report
16.02.2018 Change: Validation states published on  21.03.2018  [2018/12]
16.02.2018 Change - extension states published on  21.03.2018  [2018/12]
09.02.2018 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
02.02.2018 First examination report
04.12.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
15.09.2017 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  18.10.2017  [2017/42]
15.09.2017 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
15.09.2017 Request for examination filed published on  18.10.2017  [2017/42]
18.08.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
14.07.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
29.06.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
09.06.2017 Amendment by applicant
07.06.2017 Change - representative
07.06.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
22.06.2016 PCT data prior to European publication
17.06.2016 PCT data prior to European publication
06.01.2016 PCT data prior to European publication