Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3229790

EP3229790 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS COMPRISING MEDIUM CHAIN TRIGLYCERIDES FOR TREATMENT OF EPILEPSY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  12.02.2019
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.09.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  07.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.02.2019First examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nestec S.A.
Avenue Nestlé 55
1800 Vevey / CH
[2017/42]
Inventor(s)01 / PAN, Yuanlong
334 Waverly Place Ct.
Chesterfield, Missouri 63017 / US
02 / ZANGHI, Brian, Michael
523 Arbor Meadow Drive
Ballwin, Missouri 63021 / US
03 / BOUTHEGOURD, Jean-christophe
24 boulevard Gambetta
95110 Sannois / FR
 [2017/42]
Representative(s)Elkington & Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2017/42]Krishnan, Sri
Nestec S.A.
Centre de Recherche Nestlé
Vers-chez-les-Blanc
Case Postale 44
1000 Lausanne 26 / CH
Application number, filing date15813921.207.12.2015
[2017/42]
WO2015IB59417
Priority number, dateUS201462088797P08.12.2014         Original published format: US 201462088797 P
[2017/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016092459
Date:16.06.2016
Language:EN
[2016/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3229790
Date:18.10.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.06.2016
[2017/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP16.06.2016
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/00, A61P25/08
[2017/42]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/42]
TitleGerman:ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN MIT MITTELKETTIGEN TRIGLYCERIDEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON EPILEPSIE[2017/42]
English:COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS COMPRISING MEDIUM CHAIN TRIGLYCERIDES FOR TREATMENT OF EPILEPSY[2017/42]
French:COMPOSITIONS ET PROCÉDÉS COMPRENANT DES TRIGLYCÉRIDES À CHAÎNE MOYENNE POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE L'ÉPILEPSIE[2017/42]
Entry into regional phase10.07.2017National basic fee paid 
10.07.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
10.07.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.07.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
10.07.2017Examination requested  [2017/42]
09.03.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time
16.05.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.02.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Request for further processing for:16.05.2018Request for further processing filed
16.05.2018Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
29.05.2018Decision despatched
16.05.2018Request for further processing filed
16.05.2018Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
29.05.2018Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
12.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[X]US2008260816  (HERSLOF BENGT [SE], et al) [X] 1,2,4,8,11,20 * example 2 *;
 [Y]WO2014027023  (NESTEC SA [CH]) [Y] 1-20 * page 2, line 17 - page 3, line 8 * * page 52, line 30 - page 53, line 13; claims 1,3 *;
 [XI]  - MUSA-VELOSO K ET AL, "Breath acetone predicts plasma ketone bodies in children with epilepsy on a ketogenic diet", NUTRITION, ELSEVIER INC, US, vol. 22, no. 1, ISSN 0899-9007, (20060101), pages 1 - 8, (20060101), XP027973917 [X] 1,2,4,8,12,13,15,17,18 * page 2, column right, paragraph 2 - page 3, column right, paragraph 1; tables 2,3 * [I] 5-7,10,16,19
 [X]  - BECHGAARD E ET AL, "Pharmacokinetic and pharmacodynamic response after intranasal administrationof diazepam to rabbits", JOURNAL OF PHARMACY AND PHARMACOLOGY, JOHN WILEY & SONS LTD, LONDON; GB, (19970101), vol. 49, no. 8, ISSN 0022-3573, pages 747 - 750, XP008088367 [X] 20 * page 748, column left, line 3 - line 41; tables 1,2 *
 [Y]  - PIOTR WLAZ ET AL, "Anticonvulsant profile of caprylic acid, a main constituent of the medium-chain triglyceride (MCT) ketogenic diet, in mice", NEUROPHARMACOLOGY, (20120301), vol. 62, no. 4, doi:10.1016/j.neuropharm.2011.12.015, ISSN 0028-3908, pages 1882 - 1889, XP055075889 [Y] 1-20 * abstract * * page 1883, column right, line 9 - line 22 * * page 1888, column left, line 16 - line 29 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.neuropharm.2011.12.015
by applicant   - KOSSOFF; RHO, "ketogenic diets: evidence for short and long-term efficacy", NEUROTHERAPEUTICS, (2009), vol. 6, pages 406 - 414
    - HUTTENLOCHER ET AL., "Medium-chain triglycerides as a therapy for intractable childhood epilepsy", NEUROLOGY, (1971), vol. 21, pages 1097 - 1103