EP3163964 - WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS DEVICE AND WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.2021 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.08.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.03.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.12.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.03.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Group Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2021/30] |
Former [2017/18] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAKAI, Eisuke c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 02 /
YAMAURA, Tomoya c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 03 /
SAKODA, Kazuyuki c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 04 /
ITAGAKI, Takeshi c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2017/18] | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [2017/18] | Application number, filing date | 15814048.3 | 30.06.2015 | [2017/18] | WO2015JP68883 | Priority number, date | JP20140134661 | 30.06.2014 Original published format: JP 2014134661 | WO2015JP63355 | 08.05.2015 Original published format: PCT/JP2015/063355 | [2017/18] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016002802 | Date: | 07.01.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3163964 | Date: | 03.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3163964 | Date: | 09.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.01.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/08, H04W74/08 | [2017/18] | CPC: |
H04W74/0808 (EP,US);
H04W74/0825 (US);
H04W72/00 (RU);
H04W72/54 (EP,RU,US);
H04W72/541 (US);
H04W72/542 (US);
H04W74/0816 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG UND DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN | [2017/18] | English: | WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS DEVICE AND WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS METHOD | [2017/18] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATIONS SANS FIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATIONS SANS FIL | [2017/18] | Entry into regional phase | 12.12.2016 | Translation filed | 12.12.2016 | National basic fee paid | 12.12.2016 | Search fee paid | 12.12.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.12.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/18] | 12.12.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.08.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.07.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 27.07.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.07.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP20194877.5 / EP3768024 | Opposition(s) | 10.06.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.06.2015 | AL | 09.09.2020 | AT | 09.09.2020 | CY | 09.09.2020 | CZ | 09.09.2020 | DK | 09.09.2020 | EE | 09.09.2020 | FI | 09.09.2020 | HR | 09.09.2020 | IT | 09.09.2020 | LT | 09.09.2020 | LV | 09.09.2020 | MC | 09.09.2020 | PL | 09.09.2020 | RO | 09.09.2020 | RS | 09.09.2020 | SE | 09.09.2020 | SI | 09.09.2020 | SK | 09.09.2020 | SM | 09.09.2020 | BG | 09.12.2020 | NO | 09.12.2020 | GR | 10.12.2020 | IS | 09.01.2021 | PT | 11.01.2021 | [2023/30] |
Former [2023/29] | HU | 30.06.2015 | |
AL | 09.09.2020 | ||
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
IT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
IT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
IT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 09.09.2020 | |
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 09.09.2020 | |
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 09.09.2020 | |
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/10] | FI | 09.09.2020 | |
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | FI | 09.09.2020 | |
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 09.09.2020 | |
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 09.09.2020 | |
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2007060155 (KAHANA EMANUEL [US], et al) [X] 1-10,14,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0028] * [A] 11-13; | [X]US2008008133 (ZHU JING [US], et al) [X] 1,5,8-10,14,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0024] ** paragraph [0029] * | International search | [A]JP2008538679 (Inter Digital Technology Corp.) [A] 1-20 * , paragraphs [0003] to [0021] & WO 2006/115823 A2 *; | [A] - YASUHIRO TAKENAKA et al., Zettai Wakaru! Network Trouble Kaiketsu Cho Nyumon revised edition, (20130110), pages 122 - 137, XP008185835 [A] 1-20 |