Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3162334

EP3162334 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING ABSORBENT ARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  05.06.2019
Database last updated on 15.06.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  31.03.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  20.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip07.06.2019First examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Unicharm Corporation
182 Shimobun
Kinsei-cho
Shikokuchuo-shi
Ehime 799-0111 / JP
[2017/18]
Inventor(s)01 / TANIO, Toshiyuki
c/o UNICHARM CORPORATION
Technical Center
1531-7 Wadahama
Toyohama-cho
Kanonji-shi Kagawa 769-1602 / JP
02 / KUDO, Jun
c/o UNICHARM CORPORATION
Technical Center
1531-7 Wadahama
Toyohama-cho
Kanonji-shi Kagawa 769-1602 / JP
03 / TAKAHASHI, Yuji
c/o UNICHARM CORPORATION
Technical Center
1531-7 Wadahama
Toyohama-cho
Kanonji-shi Kagawa 769-1602 / JP
04 / SHIMA, Asami
c/o UNICHARM CORPORATION
Technical Center
1531-7 Wadahama
Toyohama-cho
Kanonji-shi Kagawa 769-1602 / JP
05 / FUJITA, Tomoyuki
c/o UNICHARM CORPORATION
Technical Center
1531-7 Wadahama
Toyohama-cho
Kanonji-shi Kagawa 769-1602 / JP
 [2017/18]
Representative(s)Staeger & Sperling Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Sonnenstraße 19
80331 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2017/18]Peter, Julian
Staeger & Sperling
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Sonnenstrasse 19
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date15814087.112.05.2015
[2017/18]
WO2015JP63655
Priority number, dateJP2014013519230.06.2014         Original published format: JP 2014135192
[2017/18]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016002349
Date:07.01.2016
Language:JA
[2016/01]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3162334
Date:03.05.2017
Language:EN
[2017/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP07.01.2016
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.05.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61F13/472, A61F13/539, A61F13/42, A61L15/46, A61L15/56, A61F13/84
[2017/26]
Former International [2017/18]A61F13/15, A61F13/472, A61F13/511, A61F13/53, A61F13/539
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/18]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES SAUGFÄHIGEN ARTIKELS[2017/18]
English:METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING ABSORBENT ARTICLE[2017/18]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'ARTICLE ABSORBANT[2017/18]
Entry into regional phase19.01.2017Translation filed 
19.01.2017National basic fee paid 
19.01.2017Search fee paid 
19.01.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
19.01.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.01.2017Examination requested  [2017/18]
19.01.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
07.12.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.06.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
11.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XYI]US2004241333  (CIELENSKI PETER RYAN [US], et al) [X] 1,4,8,9,14 * paragraph [0086] - paragraph [0090]; examples 1-5 * * paragraph [0091] - paragraph [0094]; examples 6-9 * * paragraphs [0044] , [0 46] - [0053] * * paragraphs [0033] - [0041] * * paragraph [0062] * [Y] 5,6 [I] 2,3,7,10-13;
 [XI]WO2012114880  (DAIO SEISHI KK [JP], et al) [X] 1,5,8 * figures 3, 9 * * paragraph [0074] * * paragraphs [0083] - [0088] * * paragraph [0080] * [I] 2-4,6,7,10-12;
 [Y]EP2417949  (UNICHARM CORP [JP]) [Y] 5,6 * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0057]; figure 14 *;
 [A]US4186743  (STEIGER FRED H [US]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *
International search[Y]JP2010234028  (UNI CHARM CORP) [Y] 1-14 * , paragraphs [0043], [0069] to [0072]; fig. 2, 17 & US 2012/0089106 A1 & EP 2415436 A1 & CN 102378612 A *;
 [Y]JP2007525245  (The Procter & Gamble Co.) [Y] 1-14 * , paragraph [0031] & US 2004/0232024 A1 & EP 1479361 A1 & CN 1791371 A *;
 [YA]JP2002336296  (OKABE TOSHIHIKO) [Y] 10-12 * , paragraph [0023] (Family: none) * [A] 1-9, 13-14;
 [YA]JP2004016307  (KAGEYAMA YOKO) [Y] 10-12 * , paragraph [0011] (Family: none) * [A] 1-9, 13-14;
 [A]JP2008006277  (DAIO SEISHI KK) [A] 1-14 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *