Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3237485

EP3237485 - RAPID-SET EPOXY RESIN SYSTEMS AND PROCESS OF COATING PIPELINES USING THE EPOXY RESIN SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  08.06.2018
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  29.09.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  27.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.12.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dow Global Technologies LLC
2040 Dow Center
Midland, MI 48674 / US
[2017/44]
Inventor(s)01 / COLSON, Adam
2301 N. Brazosport Boulevard
Freeport, TX 77541 / US
02 / WATKINS, Avery
2301 N. Brazosport Boulevard
Freeport, TX 77541 / US
03 / KUVADIA, Zubin
2301 N. Brazosport Boulevard
Freeport, TX 77541 / US
04 / CHANG, Kwanho
53 Red Maple Court
Lake Jackson, TX 77566 / US
 [2017/44]
Representative(s)Beck Greener LLP
Fulwood House
12 Fulwood Place
London WC1V 6HR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2017/44]Raynor, John
Beck Greener
Fulwood House
12 Fulwood Place
GB-London WC1V 6HR / GB
Application number, filing date15816330.305.12.2015
[2017/44]
WO2015US64143
Priority number, dateUS201462096814P24.12.2014         Original published format: US 201462096814 P
[2017/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016105913
Date:30.06.2016
Language:EN
[2016/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3237485
Date:01.11.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.06.2016
[2017/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.06.2016
ClassificationInternational:C08G59/50, C08G59/66, C09D163/00
[2017/44]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/44]
TitleGerman:SCHNELL AUSHÄRTENDE EPOXIDHARZSYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR BESCHICHTUNG VON ROHRLEITUNGEN MIT DEM EPOXIDHARZSYSTEM[2017/44]
English:RAPID-SET EPOXY RESIN SYSTEMS AND PROCESS OF COATING PIPELINES USING THE EPOXY RESIN SYSTEM[2017/44]
French:SYSTÈMES DE RÉSINE ÉPOXY À PRISE RAPIDE ET PROCÉDÉ DE REVÊTEMENT DE CANALISATIONS AU MOYEN DU SYSTÈME DE RÉSINE ÉPOXY[2017/44]
Entry into regional phase24.07.2017National basic fee paid 
24.07.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
24.07.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.07.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
24.07.2017Examination requested  [2017/44]
17.01.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.06.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03)
07.09.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.07.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
09.09.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
12.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
13.12.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[Y]EP0075827  (DIAMOND SHAMROCK CORP [US]) [Y] 1-8,10-12 * page 4, line 25 - page 23, line 12; example XI (a) *;
 [Y]US6313257  (ABBEY KIRK J [US]) [Y] 1-8,10-12 * column 2, line 13 - column 4, line 19 * * column 6, line 35 - line 36 *;
 [Y]JP2012246464  (NOF CORP) [Y] 1-8,10-12 * paragraphs [0116] - [0115] - [ 129] , [ 130] *;
 [A]CA1056538  (CIBA GEIGY AG) [A] 1-12 * page 3, line 14 - page 4, line 4 *;
 [AP]WO2015164031  (DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES LLC [US]) [AP] 1-12 * the whole document *;
 [AP]WO2015094896  (DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES LLC [US]) [AP] 1-12 * the whole document *
by applicantUS5216170
 US6730353
 US2004258836
 US2011070387
 EP0936235
 EP2495271
 WO2007006656
 WO2010120617
 WO2012010528
 WO2012134662
 EP0502611
 US5112932
 WO2008140906