Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3233042

EP3233042 - AGENT FOR TEMPORARY SHAPING OF KERATIN-CONTAINING FIBERS HAVING A MIXTURE OF CONDITIONING POLYMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  30.11.2018
Database last updated on 18.06.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.09.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  23.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip03.04.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
[2017/43]
Inventor(s)01 / BAEK, Jisook
27 Greenway Court
Closter, NJ 07624 / US
02 / PULS (GEB. HENSCHEL), Anna
Kommandeursweg 49
21423 Winsen (Luhe) / DE
 [2017/43]
Application number, filing date15816410.311.12.2015
[2017/43]
WO2015EP79483
Priority number, dateDE20141022641018.12.2014         Original published format: DE102014226410
[2017/43]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016096671
Date:23.06.2016
Language:DE
[2016/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3233042
Date:25.10.2017
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.2016
[2017/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.06.2016
ClassificationInternational:A61K8/73, A61K8/81, A61K8/893, A61K8/894, A61Q5/06
[2017/43]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/43]
TitleGerman:MITTEL ZUR TEMPORÄREN VERFORMUNG KERATINHALTIGER FASERN MIT EINER MISCHUNG AUS KONDITIONIERENDEN POLYMEREN[2017/43]
English:AGENT FOR TEMPORARY SHAPING OF KERATIN-CONTAINING FIBERS HAVING A MIXTURE OF CONDITIONING POLYMERS[2017/43]
French:MOYENS POUR METTRE TEMPORAIREMENT EN FORME DES FIBRES KÉRATINIQUES AVEC UN MÉLANGE DE POLYMÈRES TRAITANTS[2017/43]
Entry into regional phase17.05.2017National basic fee paid 
17.05.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
17.05.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.05.2017Examination requested  [2017/43]
17.05.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
25.01.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.11.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.03.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
19.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[XYI]US2004076595  (KHAN GOLAM FARUQUE [JP]) [X] 1,2,7,8 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0026]; example 3 * * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0069] * * paragraph [0086] - paragraph [0107] * [Y] 3,4,6 [I] 5;
 [XYI]US2006292104  (GUSKEY SUSAN M [US], et al) [X] 1,2,7,9,10 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0011]; example 7 * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0103] * [Y] 3,4,6 [I] 5,8;
 [XY]WO2004100908  (HANS SCHWARZKOPF & HENKEL GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,7,9,10 * page 1, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2 * * page 3, paragraph 1 - page 7, line 6 * * page 9, paragraph 2 - page 12, paragraph 2 * * page 19, paragraph 1 - paragraph 3; examples 1-3 * * page 17, paragraph 3 * [Y] 4,6;
 [Y]US2004241130  (TAMARESELVY KRISHNAN [US], et al) [Y] 4 * paragraph [0172] - paragraph [0178]; example 17 *;
 [Y]WO2014023492  (HENKEL AG & CO KGAA [DE]) [Y] 6 * page 11, line 12 - page 13, line 18 *
 [Y]  - "Extra strong hold glue", GNPD, MINTEL, (201109), Database accession no. 1640220, XP002754627 [Y] 3 * Ingredients Product description *