Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3234647

EP3234647 - PIXEL BASED DEAD TIME CORRECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.09.2017
Database last updated on 16.01.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  15.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip12.01.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips N.V.
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[2017/43]
Inventor(s)01 / LAURENCE, Thomas Leroy
c/o High Tech Campus
Building 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
02 / WANG, Sharon Xiaorong
c/o High Tech Campus
Building 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
 [2017/43]
Representative(s)van Iersel, Hannie
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[2017/43]
Application number, filing date15816536.514.12.2015
[2017/43]
WO2015IB59594
Priority number, dateUS201462091801P15.12.2014         Original published format: US 201462091801 P
[2017/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016097977
Date:23.06.2016
Language:EN
[2016/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3234647
Date:25.10.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.2016
[2017/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.06.2016
ClassificationInternational:G01T1/17, G01T1/24
[2017/43]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/43]
TitleGerman:PIXELBASIERTE TOTZEITKORREKTUR[2017/43]
English:PIXEL BASED DEAD TIME CORRECTION[2017/43]
French:CORRECTION DE TEMPS MORT À BASE DE PIXELS[2017/43]
Entry into regional phase17.07.2017National basic fee paid 
17.07.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
17.07.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.06.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.06.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
17.07.2017Examination requested  [2017/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
02.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[Y]US2009072154  (WATSON CHARLES C [US]) [Y] 1-6,14-20 * paragraphs [0003] , [0004] , [0011] , [0029] , [0031] , [0032] , [0041]; figures 1,2 *;
 [YA]US2006091314  (WILLIAMS JOHN J [US], et al) [Y] 15,18,19 * paragraphs [0014] , [0016] , [0019] , [0022] - [0026] - [0029] * [A] 1,7;
 [Y]US5241181  (MERTENS JOHN D [US], et al) [Y] 20 * column 9, lines 37-60; figure 6 *;
 [YA]US2010057819  (PANIN VLADIMIR Y [US]) [Y] 17 * paragraphs [0012] - [0014] - [0018] * [A] 1-4,7-10,16;
 [XY]  - BYARS L G ET AL, "Variance Reduction on Randoms from Delayed Coincidence Histograms for the HRRT", NUCLEAR SCIENCE SYMPOSIUM CONFERENCE RECORD, 2005 IEEE WYNDHAM EL CONQUISTADOR RESORT, PUERTO RICO OCTOBER 23 - 29, 2005, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20051023), vol. 5, doi:10.1109/NSSMIC.2005.1596876, ISBN 978-0-7803-9221-2, pages 2622 - 2626, XP010896206 [X] 7-10 * abstract * * page 2622, column 2, paragraph last * * page 2623, column 1, paragraph 2nd - column 2, paragraph 1st * * page 2624, column 2, paragraph D - paragraph III * * page 2626, paragraph IV * [Y] 1-6,11-20

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/NSSMIC.2005.1596876
 [Y]  - TOWNSEND D W ET AL, "THREE DIMENSIONAL RECONSTRUCTION OF PET DATA FROM A MULTI-RING CAMERA", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON NUCLEAR SCIENCE, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19890201), vol. 36, no. 1, doi:10.1109/23.34605, ISSN 0018-9499, pages 1056 - 1065, XP000312956 [Y] 5,6,11,12 * page 1058, paragraph deadtime *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/23.34605
 [Y]  - PENG XIE ET AL, "Prognostic value of 18F-FDG PET-CT metabolic index for nasopharyngeal carcinoma", JOURNAL OF CANCER RESEARCH AND CLINICAL ONCOLOGY, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (20091120), vol. 136, no. 6, ISSN 1432-1335, pages 883 - 889, XP019803268 [Y] 13 * page 884, paragraph PET imaging *
 [Y]  - Glenn F Knoll, "Radiation Detection and Measurement", Radiation detection and measurement, New Jersey, NJ [u.a.], vol. Third edition, ISBN 978-0-471-07338-3, (20001212), pages 666 - 673, URL: Book, (20160223), XP055252668 [Y] 20 * page 670 - page 671, paragraph 1; figures 17.46,17.47 *
 [A]  - WATSON C C, "A hybrid algorithm for randoms variance reduction", 2009 IEEE NUCLEAR SCIENCE SYMPOSIUM AND MEDICAL IMAGING CONFERENCE (NSS/MIC 2009), ORLANDO, FL, USA, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20091024), ISBN 978-1-4244-3961-4, pages 3882 - 3885, XP031826545 [A] 1,7,15 * page 3882, column 1, paragraph last *