Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3229672

EP3229672 - BEDSIDE INTERFACE FOR PERCUTANEOUS CORONARY INTERVENTION PLANNING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.09.2017
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  09.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip03.01.2020New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips N.V.
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
For all designated states
Volcano Corporation
3721 Valley Center Drive
Suite 500
San Diego, CA 92130 / US
[2017/42]
Inventor(s)01 / KELLER, Jacqueline
c/o High Tech Campus
Building 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
 [2017/42]
Representative(s)Philips Intellectual Property & Standards
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2017/42]Steffen, Thomas
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date15816878.102.12.2015
[2017/42]
WO2015IB59272
Priority number, dateUS201462089051P08.12.2014         Original published format: US 201462089051 P
[2017/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016092422
Date:16.06.2016
Language:EN
[2016/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3229672
Date:18.10.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.06.2016
[2017/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP16.06.2016
ClassificationInternational:A61B5/02, A61B5/0215, A61B8/08, A61B8/12
[2017/42]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/42]
TitleGerman:BETTSEITIGE SCHNITTSTELLE FÜR DIE PLANUNG PERKUTANER KORONARINTERVENTIONEN[2017/42]
English:BEDSIDE INTERFACE FOR PERCUTANEOUS CORONARY INTERVENTION PLANNING[2017/42]
French:INTERFACE DE CHEVET POUR PLANIFICATION D'INTERVENTION CORONARIENNE PERCUTANÉE[2017/42]
Entry into regional phase10.07.2017National basic fee paid 
10.07.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
10.07.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.06.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.06.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
10.07.2017Examination requested  [2017/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
02.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
02.01.2020Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[XAYI]US2014188503  (BALIGNASAY APOLLO [US], et al) [X] 1-9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0021] - [0032] - [0040] , [0041] * [A] 13-15 [Y] 10 [I] 11,12;
 [AD]US8754865  (MERRITT FERGUS [US], et al) [AD] 1-15 * abstract *;
 [AD]WO2013028612  (VOLCANO CORP [US], et al) [AD] 1-15 * abstract *
 [Y]  - VOLCANO, "Operator's Manual: For use with Volcano Imaging and Pressure Systems (Software Version Level 3.4.X)", INTERNET CITATION, (201404), pages 1 - 64, URL: http://medicalvision.com.au/wp-content/uploads/2014/08/FFR-and-iFR%C2%AE-Modality-Operator-Manual.pdf, (20151022), XP002748190 [Y] 10 * page 11 *
by applicantUS8754865
 WO2013028612