blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3233722


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
05.02.2019 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
20.04.2018 Change - representative
23.02.2018 Change: Validation states published on  28.03.2018  [2018/13]
23.02.2018 Change - extension states published on  28.03.2018  [2018/13]
03.02.2018 Amendment by applicant
12.01.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
22.09.2017 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  25.10.2017  [2017/43]
22.09.2017 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
22.09.2017 Request for examination filed published on  25.10.2017  [2017/43]
01.09.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
21.07.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
29.06.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
02.06.2017 Change - representative
02.06.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
30.06.2016 PCT data prior to European publication
24.06.2016 PCT data prior to European publication
01.06.2016 PCT data prior to European publication
13.01.2016 PCT data prior to European publication