blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP3233722
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3233722Global Dossier 25.10.2017A1
Priority number Date
WO2015EP80000 16.12.2015
EP14199465 19.12.2014
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2016096990Global Dossier 23.06.2016A1
Priority number Date
EP14199465 19.12.2014