Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3233722

EP3233722 - PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF OXIDE MATERIALS, LAYERED DOUBLE HYDROXIDE MATERIALS, HYDROXIDE MATERIALS AND CARBONATE-BASED MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.09.2017
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  02.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip05.02.2019New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BASF SE
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE
[2017/43]
Inventor(s)01 / SCHUNK, Stephan A.
Franz-Kruckenberg-Strasse 84
69126 Heidelberg-Rohrbach / DE
02 / LIZANDARA, Carlos
Kranichweg 58
69123 Heidelberg / DE
03 / FUTTER, Cornelia
Bergheimer Strasse 84
69115 Heidelberg / DE
04 / EMMERT, Timo
Schlosstrasse 1
76661 Philippsburg / DE
 [2017/43]
Representative(s)BASF IP Association
BASF SE
G-FLP-C006
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2017/43]BASF IP Association
BASF SE
G-FLP-C006
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Application number, filing date15817202.316.12.2015
[2017/43]
WO2015EP80000
Priority number, dateEP2014019946519.12.2014         Original published format: EP 14199465
[2017/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016096990
Date:23.06.2016
Language:EN
[2016/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3233722
Date:25.10.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.2016
[2017/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.06.2016
ClassificationInternational:C01B13/32, C01F7/00, C01F7/02
[2017/43]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/43]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON OXIDMATERIALIEN, GESCHICHTETEN DOPPELHYDROXIDMATERIALIEN, HYDROXIDMATERIALIEN UND CARBONATBASIERTEN MATERIALIEN[2017/43]
English:PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF OXIDE MATERIALS, LAYERED DOUBLE HYDROXIDE MATERIALS, HYDROXIDE MATERIALS AND CARBONATE-BASED MATERIALS[2017/43]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DE MATÉRIAUX DE TYPE OXYDE, DE MATÉRIAUX DE TYPE HYDROXYDE DOUBLE LAMELLAIRE, DE MATÉRIAUX DE TYPE HYDROXYDE ET DE MATÉRIAUX À BASE DE CARBONATE[2017/43]
Entry into regional phase19.07.2017National basic fee paid 
19.07.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
19.07.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.06.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
19.07.2017Examination requested  [2017/43]
01.02.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201804   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[XYI]US2004179996  (SHAN ZHIPING [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4,10,11,13 * paragraph [0046]; example 11; claims 11,13; table 1 * [Y] 6 [I] 7-9;
 [XYI]US2005238569  (CHOUDARY BOYAPATI M [IN], et al) [X] 1-5,10-13 * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0059]; examples 1-9; claims 1,10,33 * [Y] 6 [I] 7-9;
 [XYI]EP0199930  (ALLIED CORP [US]) [X] 1,3,4,10 * claims 1-4 * [Y] 6 [I] 7-9;
 [Y]US2001001653  (NOWECK KLAUS [DE], et al) [Y] 6 * examples 1-10 *
 [X]  BRAVO-SUAREZ J J ET AL, "Microtextural properties of layered double hydroxides: a theoretical and structural model", MICROPOROUS AND MESOPOROUS MATERIALS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHING, NEW YORK, US, (20040108), vol. 67, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.MICROMESO.2003.10.003, ISSN 1387-1811, pages 1 - 17, XP004482590 [X] 11-13 * table 10 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.micromeso.2003.10.003