Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3209862

EP3209862 - ESTIMATE OF COMPACTION WITH BOREHOLE GRAVITY MEASUREMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  01.11.2019
Database last updated on 21.02.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  16.05.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  28.07.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  09.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip01.11.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 04.12.2019  [2019/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Baker Hughes, a GE company, LLC
17021 Aldine Westfield
Houston, TX 77073 / US
[2019/45]
Former [2017/35]For all designated states
Baker Hughes Incorporated
P.O. Box 4740
Houston, TX 77210-4740 / US
Inventor(s)01 / VASILEVSKIY, Alexandr Nikolaevich
ul. Kutateladze 4A
Novosibirsk 630090 / RU
02 / EDWARDS, Carl
23303 Millcross Lane
Katy, Texas 77494 / US
03 / DAOUD, Mohamed
94 Acacia Park Circle
Katy, Texas 77382 / US
04 / CSUTAK, Sebastian
2001 Rankin Road
Houston, Texas 77073 / US
 [2017/35]
Representative(s)BRP Renaud & Partner mbB Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Steuerberater
Königstraße 28
70173 Stuttgart / DE
[2019/49]
Former [2017/35]Davies, Christopher Robert
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
Application number, filing date15817602.419.10.2015
[2017/35]
WO2015RU00685
Priority number, dateUS201462066073P20.10.2014         Original published format: US 201462066073 P
[2017/35]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016064301
Date:28.04.2016
Language:EN
[2016/17]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3209862
Date:30.08.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.04.2016
[2017/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3209862
Date:04.12.2019
Language:EN
[2019/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.04.2016
ClassificationInternational:E21B49/00
[2017/35]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/35]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
TitleGerman:SCHÄTZUNG DER VERDICHTUNG MIT BOHRLOCHSCHWERKRAFTMESSUNGEN[2017/35]
English:ESTIMATE OF COMPACTION WITH BOREHOLE GRAVITY MEASUREMENTS[2017/35]
French:ESTIMATION DE COMPACTAGE AU MOYEN DE MESURES GRAVIMÉTRIQUES DE TROU DE FORAGE[2017/35]
Entry into regional phase08.05.2017National basic fee paid 
08.05.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
08.05.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.05.2017Examination requested  [2017/35]
08.05.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
21.12.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.05.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.09.2019Fee for grant paid
25.09.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
25.09.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
11.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
21.10.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[A]US5753813  (HAGIWARA TERUHIKO [US]) [A] 1,10,18 * abstract *;
 [A]US2010107753  (BOURNE STEPHEN JAMES [NL], et al) [A] 1,10,18 * abstract * * paragraphs [0053] - [0056] - [0064] *;
 [A]US4457077  (LAUTZENHISER THEODORE V [US]) [A] 1,10,18 * abstract *;
 [A]US2014165720  (EDWARDS CARL M [US], et al) [A] 1,10,18 * abstract * * paragraphs [0028] , [0042] , [0045]; claims 1,2 *;
 [A]US2009223291  (DONADILLE JEAN-MARC [SA], et al) [A] 1,10,18 * abstract * * paragraphs [0010] , [0011] *;
 [A]US2004182147  (RAMBOW FREDERICK H K [US], et al) [A] 1,10,18 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5705812  (BREWER JAMES E [US], et al) [A] 1,10,18 * the whole document *
by applicantUS2012271549
    - FERTL, W.; G. V. CHILINGARIAN ET AL., "Surveillance Technology To Detect And Monitor Compaction And Subsidence Effects", FERTL, W.; G. V. CHILINGARIAN ET AL., G. V. CHILINGARIAN, E. C. DONALDSON AND T. F. YEN,, Subsidence Due to Fluid Withdrawal, ELSEVIER, (1995), vol. 439
    - SULAK, R. M.; J. DANIELSEN, "Reservoir Aspects of Ekofisk Subsidence", JOURNAL OF PETROLEUM TECHNOLOGY, (1989), vol. 41, no. 7