Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3221376

EP3221376 - CURABLE EPOXY COMPOSITION INCLUDING ACCELERATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2017/39]Curable Epoxy Composition Including Accelerator
[2019/35]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  07.08.2019
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  06.07.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  25.08.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip08.01.2020New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dow Global Technologies LLC
2040 Dow Center
Midland, MI 48674 / US
[2017/39]
Inventor(s)01 / QIAN, Huifeng
2301 North Brazosport Boulevard
Freeport, TX 77541 / US
02 / HUNTER, Gary A.
2301 North Brazosport Boulevard
Freeport, TX 77541 / US
03 / GULYAS, Gyongyi
2301 North Brazosport Boulevard
Freeport, TX 77541 / US
 [2017/39]
Representative(s)Beck Greener LLP
Fulwood House
12 Fulwood Place
London WC1V 6HR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2017/39]Raynor, John
Beck Greener
Fulwood House
12 Fulwood Place
GB-London WC1V 6HR / GB
Application number, filing date15819907.518.11.2015
[2017/39]
WO2015US61253
Priority number, dateUS201462082180P20.11.2014         Original published format: US 201462082180 P
US201562248362P30.10.2015         Original published format: US 201562248362 P
[2017/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016081550
Date:26.05.2016
Language:EN
[2016/21]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3221376
Date:27.09.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.2016
[2017/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.05.2016
ClassificationInternational:C08G59/22, C08G59/50, C08G59/68, C08G59/72, B29C70/52, B29C70/48, B29K63/00, B29K105/06, C08J5/04, C08G59/38
[2019/35]
Former International [2017/39]C08G59/22, C08G59/50, C08G59/68, C08G59/72, B29C70/52
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/39]
TitleGerman:HÄRTBARE EPOXIDZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT BESCHLEUNIGER[2017/39]
English:CURABLE EPOXY COMPOSITION INCLUDING ACCELERATOR[2019/35]
French:COMPOSITION ÉPOXY DURCISSABLE COMPRENANT UN ACCÉLÉRATEUR[2017/39]
Former [2017/39]Curable Epoxy Composition Including Accelerator
Entry into regional phase16.06.2017National basic fee paid 
16.06.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
16.06.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.06.2017Examination requested  [2017/39]
16.06.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
14.02.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.07.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.07.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.07.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.11.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.08.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
14.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.201905   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[I]US2001018122  (YUYAMA MASAHIRO [JP], et al) [I] 1-11 * examples 1-5 * * claims 1-9 * * page 2, paragraph [0019] * * page 1, paragraph [0014] *;
 [A]US2008145634  (HILLERMEIER ROMAN [DE], et al) [A] 1-11 * claims 1-28 * * examples 1-3 *;
 [A]US5541000  (HARDY LESLIE C [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * examples 1-6 * * tables I-V * * claims 1-19 *;
 [A]US4725652  (BERTRAM JAMES L [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * claims 1-96 * * examples 1-25 *
by applicantUS7867568