Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3227360

EP3227360 - ANTIOXIDANT-INFUSED ULTRA HIGH MOLECULAR WEIGHT POLYETHYLENE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  20.02.2019
Database last updated on 19.08.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.09.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  30.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip11.07.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Zimmer, Inc.
1800 W. Center Street
Warsaw, Indiana 46580 / US
[2017/41]
Inventor(s)01 / PLETCHER, Dirk
505 Indiana Street
Walkerton, Indiana 46574 / US
 [2017/41]
Representative(s)Mays, Julie , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London, EC1A 4HD / GB
[2017/41]
Application number, filing date15820349.703.12.2015
[2017/41]
WO2015US63621
Priority number, dateUS201462086936P03.12.2014         Original published format: US 201462086936 P
[2017/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016090084
Date:09.06.2016
Language:EN
[2016/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3227360
Date:11.10.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.06.2016
[2017/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP09.06.2016
ClassificationInternational:C08J3/12, A61L27/16
[2017/41]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/41]
TitleGerman:MIT ANTIOXIDATIONSMITTEL INFUNDIERTES POLYETHYLEN MIT ULTRAHOHEM MOLEKULARGEWICHT[2017/41]
English:ANTIOXIDANT-INFUSED ULTRA HIGH MOLECULAR WEIGHT POLYETHYLENE[2017/41]
French:PRÉPARATION D'UN POLYÉTHYLÈNE DE POIDS MOLÉCULAIRE TRÈS ÉLEVÉ IMPRÉGNÉ D'ANTIOXYDANT[2017/41]
Entry into regional phase29.06.2017National basic fee paid 
29.06.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
29.06.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.06.2017Examination requested  [2017/41]
29.06.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
13.02.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.02.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.07.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
07.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[XYI]WO2010003688  (SMITH & NEPHEW ORTHOPAEDICS AG [CH], et al) [X] 1-8,16,17,20 * page 14, line 6 - page 15, line l; figures 5,7; example 3; claims 1,2,5-9,14,17-19,22,23,38,40-45 * * page 3, line 4 - line 5 * [Y] 9-15,18,19 [I] 9-15,18,19;
 [Y]WO2004064618  (MASSACHUSETTS GEN HOSPITAL [US], et al) [Y] 9-15,18,19 * page 1, line 16 - line 24 * * page 3, line 24 - line 30 * * page 16, line 28 - line 30 * * page 17, line 1 - line 10; figures 1,2 * * page 21, line 1 - line 9 * * page 22, line 21 - page 23, line 10 * * page 23, line 24 - line 29 * * page 25, line 4 - line 9 * * page 24, line 3 - line 8; claims 78,79 * * page 30, line 16 - page 31, line 3; claims 41,45,62,65,68,70 * * page 31, line 31 - page 32, line 24 * * page 40, line 20 - page 41, line 7; table 1 *;
 [X]WO2008124825  (ZIMMER INC [US], et al) [X] 20 * claims 24,31,34,35,42 *;
 [X]US2008215142  (MURATOGLU ORHUN K [US], et al) [X] 20 * paragraph [0383]; figure 23; example 23 *;
 [XP]WO2015138137  (ZIMMER INC [US]) [XP] 20 * paragraph [0115]; claims 20,1-19 *
by applicantUS8399535