Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3233378

EP3233378 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR IMPACT FORMING A COTTER PIN [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  25.01.2019
Database last updated on 20.08.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.09.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  12.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip29.03.2019New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee 
29.03.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bendix Spicer Foundation Brake LLC
901 Cleveland Avenue
Elyria, OH 44035 / US
[2017/43]
Inventor(s)01 / JONES, Jeffrey, L.
901 Cleveland Street
Elyria, OH 44035 / US
02 / ENNIS, Daniel
901 Cleveland Street
Elyria, OH 44035 / US
 [2017/43]
Representative(s)Specht, Peter , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[2017/43]
Application number, filing date15820708.410.12.2015
[2017/43]
WO2015US65004
Priority number, dateUS20141457003315.12.2014         Original published format: US201414570033
[2017/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016100087
Date:23.06.2016
Language:EN
[2016/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3233378
Date:25.10.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.2016
[2017/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.06.2016
ClassificationInternational:B25B27/08
[2017/43]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/43]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM STANZFORMEN EINES FEDERSTECKERS[2017/43]
English:APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR IMPACT FORMING A COTTER PIN[2017/43]
French:APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE FORMATION PAR IMPACT D'UNE GOUPILLE FENDUE[2017/43]
Entry into regional phase11.07.2017National basic fee paid 
11.07.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
11.07.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.07.2017Examination requested  [2017/43]
11.07.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
10.01.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.01.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
26.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201804   M06   Fee paid on   26.03.2019
Cited inInternational search[XA]US2802383  (BABYAK GEORGE H) [X] 10-15 * fig. 2; col. 2, l. 33 - col. 4, l. 11 * [A] 1-9,16-19;
 [XAI]US2330013  (MATHEW SCHULTZ JOSEPH) [X] 10-12,15 * fig. 3 * [A] 1-9,16-19 [I] 14;
 [X]US2821100  (DECKER ROBERT W) [X] 10,11,13,15 * fig. 1-4; col. 2, ll. 24-43 *;
 [A]US1516877  (JOHN ANEKEE) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *