Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3235711

EP3235711 - A SUSPENSION SYSTEM FOR VEHICLES WITH AT LEAST TWO WHEELS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.09.2017
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  05.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.02.2018Change: Validation statespublished on 28.03.2018  [2018/13]
23.02.2018Change - extension statespublished on 28.03.2018  [2018/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pisà Canyelles, Roger
C/ Casesnoves 12
07320 Santa Maria del Cami / ES
[2017/43]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2017/43]
Representative(s)Sugrañes Patentes y Marcas
Calle Provenza 304
08008 Barcelona / ES
[2017/43]
Application number, filing date15820874.403.12.2015
[2017/43]
WO2015ES70875
Priority number, dateES2014003184716.12.2014         Original published format: ES 201431847
[2017/43]
Filing languageES
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016097433
Date:23.06.2016
Language:ES
[2016/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3235711
Date:25.10.2017
Language:EN
[2017/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.06.2016
ClassificationInternational:B62K25/28
[2017/43]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/43]
TitleGerman:AUFHÄNGUNGSSYSTEM FÜR FAHRZEUGE MIT MINDESTENS ZWEI RÄDERN[2017/43]
English:A SUSPENSION SYSTEM FOR VEHICLES WITH AT LEAST TWO WHEELS[2017/43]
French:SYSTÈME DE SUSPENSION POUR VÉHICULES POURVUS D'AU MOINS DEUX ROUES[2017/43]
Entry into regional phase04.07.2017Translation filed 
04.07.2017National basic fee paid 
04.07.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
04.07.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.07.2017Examination requested  [2017/43]
04.07.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
09.01.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XY]US2014001729  (HUDEC CHRISTOPHER [CA]) [X] 1,4-7,12,17 * paragraphs [0029] , [0037] , [0084] - [0085] - [0088] - [0089] - [0091] , [0093] , [0099] , [0100]; figures 42,43,46,47,51,52 * [Y] 2;
 [YA]EP2706002  (WINORA STAIGER GMBH [DE]) [Y] 2 * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0062]; figures 5,6 * [A] 1;
 [A]EP2535252  (SHIFT UP ENGINEERING [FR]) [A] 1-17 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0037]; figures 2a,2b,4 *;
 [A]US5860665  (GILES RIVERS [US]) [A] 1-17 * column 3, line 34 - column 3, line 50; figure 3 *;
 [A]US2009001686  (CURRIE CHRISTOPHER S [US]) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *;
 [A]GB2482160  (ATB SALES LTD [GB]) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2004256834  (WHYTE JON FRANK ROSS [GB]) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE19745380  (STRAUBHAAR WALTER [CH]) [A] 1-17 * column 2 - column 3; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US2006225942  (WEAGLE DAVID [US]) [A] 1-17 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0230]; figures 2a-2d,3a-3d,20-22,38,42 *