Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3233856

EP3233856 - A PROCESS FOR PREPARING HALOGENATED AZAINDOLE COMPOUNDS USING PYBROP [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  03.08.2018
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.09.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  13.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip03.08.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 05.09.2018  [2018/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
VIIV HEALTHCARE UK (NO. 4) LIMITED
980 Great West Road
Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB
[2017/43]
Inventor(s)01 / GONZALEZ-BOBES, Francisco
c/o Bristol-Myers Squibb Company
1 Squibb Drive
New Brunswick, New Jersey 08903 / US
02 / BULTMAN, Michael S.
c/o Bristol-Myers Squibb Company
1 Squibb Drive
New Brunswick, New Jersey 08903 / US
03 / COHEN, Benjamin
c/o Bristol-Myers Squibb Company
1 Squibb Drive
New Brunswick, New Jersey 08903 / US
04 / HICKEY, Matthew R.
c/o Bristol-Myers Squibb Company
1 Squibb Drive
New Brunswick, New Jersey 08903 / US
 [2017/43]
Representative(s)Learoyd, Stephanie Anne
GlaxoSmithKline
Global Patents (CN925.1)
980 Great West Road
Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB
[2017/43]
Application number, filing date15820976.717.12.2015
[2017/43]
WO2015US66355
Priority number, dateUS201462093638P18.12.2014         Original published format: US 201462093638 P
[2017/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016100651
Date:23.06.2016
Language:EN
[2016/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3233856
Date:25.10.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.2016
[2017/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.06.2016
ClassificationInternational:C07D471/04, C07F9/09, A61K31/437, A61P31/18
[2017/43]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/43]
Extension statesBA11.07.2017
ME11.07.2017
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON HALOGENIERTEN AZAINDOLVERBINDUNGEN MIT PYBROP[2017/43]
English:A PROCESS FOR PREPARING HALOGENATED AZAINDOLE COMPOUNDS USING PYBROP[2017/43]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DE COMPOSÉS D'AZA-INDOLE HALOGÉNÉ EN UTILISANT DU PYBROP[2017/43]
Entry into regional phase11.07.2017National basic fee paid 
11.07.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
11.07.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.07.2017Examination requested  [2017/43]
11.07.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
27.02.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/36]
09.04.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time  [2018/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XI]WO2013119625  (SQUIBB BRISTOL MYERS CO [US]) [X] 1 * claim 16 and Scheme in page 20 * [I] 2-11;
 [A]WO2007127731  (SQUIBB BRISTOL MYERS CO [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * compound E1 in page 59 *;
 [A]WO2009158394  (SQUIBB BRISTOL MYERS CO [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * compound J-In-2 in p. 88 *;
 [XI]  - KE CHEN ET AL, "Synthesis of the 6-Azaindole Containing HIV-1 Attachment Inhibitor Pro-Drug, BMS-663068", THE JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, US, (20140919), vol. 79, no. 18, doi:10.1021/jo5016008, ISSN 0022-3263, pages 8757 - 8767, XP055251332 [X] 1,2,5,8 * the whole document * [I] 3,4,6,7,9-11

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo5016008
by applicantUS7354924
 US7745625
 US8436168
 US8889869
 WO2013US24880