Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3233712

EP3233712 - DEVICE FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DROPING OBJECTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2017/43]DEVICE TO PROTECT AGAINST FALLING OBJECTS
[2018/50]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  03.12.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.09.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  15.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.03.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 17.04.2019 [2019/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MANITOU BF
430 Rue de l'Aubinière
44150 Ancenis / FR
[2017/43]
Inventor(s)01 / CHAMPION, Philippe
La Tupinière
44370 Montrelais / FR
 [2017/43]
Representative(s)Godineau, Valérie , et al
Ipsilon
3, rue Edouard Nignon
44300 Nantes / FR
[2017/43]
Application number, filing date15821137.515.12.2015
[2017/43]
WO2015FR53529
Priority number, dateFR2014006239615.12.2014         Original published format: FR 1462396
[2017/43]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016097594
Date:23.06.2016
Language:FR
[2016/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3233712
Date:25.10.2017
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.2016
[2017/43]
Type: B1  Patent specification
No.:EP3233712
Date:17.04.2019
Language:FR
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.06.2016
ClassificationInternational:B66F9/075, E02F9/16, B60R21/11
[2017/43]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/43]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUM SCHUTZ VOR HERAB FALLENDEN GEGENSTÄNDEN[2018/50]
English:DEVICE FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DROPING OBJECTS[2018/50]
French:DISPOSITIF DE PROTECTION CONTRE LA CHUTE D'OBJETS[2017/43]
Former [2017/43]VORRICHTUNG ZUM SCHUTZ VOR FALLENDEN OBJEKTEN
Former [2017/43]DEVICE TO PROTECT AGAINST FALLING OBJECTS
Entry into regional phase12.06.2017National basic fee paid 
12.06.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
12.06.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.06.2017Examination requested  [2017/43]
12.06.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
12.12.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.12.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.03.2019Fee for grant paid
07.03.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
07.03.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
19.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[A]JPH04123853U  (-------) [A] 1-10 * figure - *;
 [A]JP2014114661  (KOBELCO CONSTR MACHINERY LTD) [A] 1-4 * figures 2-5, 10 *;
 [AD]US4153262  (DIAMOND JACK, et al) [AD] 1,5,9,10 * figures 2, 3 *;
 [A]JPS6216059U  (-------) [A] 1,6,10 * figures 3, 4 *;
 [A]US2806618  (COOK CHARLES J) [A] 1,10 * figure 1 * * column 2, line 54 - line 67 *;
 [A]US2014292032  (SASAKI MAKOTO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * figures 4-10 * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0070] - paragraph [0074] *;
 [A]JP2014105455  (KOBELCO CONSTR MACHINERY LTD) [A] 1 * figures 2-6 *;
 [A]JP2013159909  (KOBELCO CONSTR MACHINERY LTD) [A] 1 * figure - *;
 [AD]DE8902041U  (PORSCHE A.G.) [AD] 1,7 * figure - *
by applicantUS4153262
 DE8902041U