Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3235308

EP3235308 - CALL SUSTAINABILITY DURING POWER IMBALANCE IN MULTICARRIER UPLINK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  03.05.2019
Database last updated on 11.11.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  06.04.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.09.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  04.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip03.05.2019Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 05.06.2019  [2019/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
[2017/43]
Inventor(s)01 / KANAMARLAPUDI, Sitaramanjaneyulu
QUALCOMM Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
02 / CHAKRAVARTHY, Chetan Gopalakrishnan
QUALCOMM Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
03 / HSU, Liangchi
QUALCOMM Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
 [2017/43]
Representative(s)Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[2017/43]
Application number, filing date15821186.203.12.2015
[2017/43]
WO2015US63819
Priority number, dateUS201462094896P19.12.2014         Original published format: US 201462094896 P
US20151479081902.07.2015         Original published format: US201514790819
[2017/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016099935
Date:23.06.2016
Language:EN
[2016/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3235308
Date:25.10.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.2016
[2017/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.06.2016
ClassificationInternational:H04W52/34, H04W72/08, H04W72/12
[2017/43]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/43]
TitleGerman:ANRUFTRAGFÄHIGKEIT WÄHREND EINES LEISTUNGSUNGLEICHGEWICHTS IN MEHRTRÄGER-UPLINK[2017/43]
English:CALL SUSTAINABILITY DURING POWER IMBALANCE IN MULTICARRIER UPLINK[2017/43]
French:PÉRENNITÉ D'APPEL LORS D'UN DÉSÉQUILIBRE DE PUISSANCE DANS UNE TRANSMISSION DE LIAISON MONTANTE À PORTEUSES MULTIPLES[2017/43]
Entry into regional phase03.05.2017National basic fee paid 
03.05.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
03.05.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.05.2017Examination requested  [2017/43]
03.05.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
13.12.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.04.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.07.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.08.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.01.2019Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/23]
23.01.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2019/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201804   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]EP2306779  (ALCATEL LUCENT [FR]) [X] 1-3,11-13 * paragraph [0067] - paragraph [0074] * * paragraph [0090] - paragraph [0095] *;
 [A]US2011081936  (HAIM JOHN W [US] ET AL) [A] 1-3,11-13 * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0056] *
 [XA]  - NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS ET AL, "E-TFC selection for DC-HSUPA", 3GPP DRAFT; R2-093101, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20090428), no. San Francisco, USA; 20090428, XP050340843 [X] 1,2,11,12 * page 1, line 1 - line 4 * * page 1, line 16 - line 22 * * page 1, line 40 - page 2, line 1 * [A] 3,13