Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3234419

EP3234419 - RADIAL SEAL AND ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  22.06.2018
Database last updated on 22.09.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.09.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  13.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip30.06.2018New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Eaton Corporation
1000 Eaton Boulevard
Cleveland, OH 44122 / US
[2017/43]
Inventor(s)01 / BERARD, Gerald, Maurice
61 Julia Drive
North Providence, RI 02911 / US
02 / RUGGERI, Edward, Nicholas
496 Old Bedford Road
Westport, MA 02790 / US
 [2017/43]
Representative(s)Schwan Schorer & Partner mbB
Patentanwälte
Bauerstrasse 22
80796 München / DE
[2017/43]
Application number, filing date15821230.817.12.2015
[2017/43]
WO2015US66322
Priority number, dateUS201462093792P18.12.2014         Original published format: US 201462093792 P
[2017/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016100636
Date:23.06.2016
Language:EN
[2016/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3234419
Date:25.10.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.2016
[2017/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.06.2016
ClassificationInternational:F16J15/3288, F01D11/00, F16J15/3292, F16J15/16, F16J15/54, F16J15/34
[2017/43]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/43]
TitleGerman:RADIALDICHTUNG UND ANORDNUNG[2017/43]
English:RADIAL SEAL AND ASSEMBLY[2017/43]
French:JOINT D'ÉTANCHÉITÉ RADIAL ET ENSEMBLE[2017/43]
Entry into regional phase12.07.2017National basic fee paid 
12.07.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
12.07.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.07.2017Examination requested  [2017/43]
12.07.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
08.03.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.06.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[X]US2008217861  (SEI CHUGEN [JP]) [X] 1-20 * paragraphs [0016] , [0 17]; figures 1-4; claims 1-18 *;
 [X]US2005046114  (BOHNER STEPHAN ERNST [CA]) [X] 1-20 * paragraphs [0083] , [0 84] , [ 104] , [ 105]; figures 1c, 2, 9a; claims 1, 17, 33, 45, 48 *;
 [X]US4752077  (HOFFELNER HERBERT [DE]) [X] 1-20 * column 2, line 61 - column 3, line 8; figures 1, 3; claims 1-15 * * column 4, lines 54-55 *