Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3157230

EP3157230 - METHOD FOR ACQUIRING IDENTIFIER OF TERMINAL IN NETWORK, MANAGEMENT NETWORK ELEMENT AND STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.09.2019
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  12.10.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  29.05.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  20.03.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  13.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip20.12.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 22.01.2020  [2020/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ZTE Corporation
ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN
[2017/16]
Inventor(s)01 / CHENG, Li
ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
02 / RUI, Tong
ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
03 / SUN, Mo
ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
 [2017/16]
Representative(s)Savi, Massimiliano , et al
NOTARBARTOLO & GERVASI S.p.A.
Corso di Porta Vittoria 9
20122 Milano / IT
[2017/16]
Application number, filing date15821558.216.04.2015
[2017/16]
WO2015CN76769
Priority number, dateCN20141033751215.07.2014         Original published format: CN201410337512
[2017/16]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016008320
Date:21.01.2016
Language:ZH
[2016/03]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3157230
Date:19.04.2017
Language:EN
[2017/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3157230
Date:14.11.2018
Language:EN
[2018/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN21.01.2016
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.06.2017
ClassificationInternational:H04L29/12
[2017/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/16]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR ERFASSUNG DER KENNUNG EINES ENDGERÄTS IN EINEM NETZWERK, VERWALTUNGSNETZWERKELEMENT UND SPEICHERMEDIUM[2017/16]
English:METHOD FOR ACQUIRING IDENTIFIER OF TERMINAL IN NETWORK, MANAGEMENT NETWORK ELEMENT AND STORAGE MEDIUM[2017/16]
French:PROCÉDÉ D'ACQUISITION D'IDENTIFIANT DE TERMINAL DANS UN RÉSEAU, ÉLÉMENT DE RÉSEAU DE GESTION ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE[2017/16]
Entry into regional phase12.01.2017Translation filed 
12.01.2017National basic fee paid 
12.01.2017Search fee paid 
12.01.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
12.01.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.01.2017Examination requested  [2017/16]
12.01.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
26.01.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.05.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.09.2018Fee for grant paid
25.09.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
25.09.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)15.08.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
26.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL14.11.2018
AT14.11.2018
CZ14.11.2018
DK14.11.2018
EE14.11.2018
ES14.11.2018
FI14.11.2018
HR14.11.2018
IT14.11.2018
LT14.11.2018
LV14.11.2018
MC14.11.2018
NL14.11.2018
PL14.11.2018
RO14.11.2018
RS14.11.2018
SE14.11.2018
SI14.11.2018
SK14.11.2018
SM14.11.2018
BG14.02.2019
NO14.02.2019
GR15.02.2019
IS14.03.2019
PT14.03.2019
LU16.04.2019
[2020/04]
Former [2020/02]AL14.11.2018
AT14.11.2018
CZ14.11.2018
DK14.11.2018
EE14.11.2018
ES14.11.2018
FI14.11.2018
HR14.11.2018
IT14.11.2018
LT14.11.2018
LV14.11.2018
MC14.11.2018
NL14.11.2018
PL14.11.2018
RO14.11.2018
RS14.11.2018
SE14.11.2018
SI14.11.2018
SK14.11.2018
SM14.11.2018
BG14.02.2019
NO14.02.2019
GR15.02.2019
IS14.03.2019
PT14.03.2019
Former [2019/50]AL14.11.2018
AT14.11.2018
CZ14.11.2018
DK14.11.2018
EE14.11.2018
ES14.11.2018
FI14.11.2018
HR14.11.2018
IT14.11.2018
LT14.11.2018
LV14.11.2018
NL14.11.2018
PL14.11.2018
RO14.11.2018
RS14.11.2018
SE14.11.2018
SI14.11.2018
SK14.11.2018
SM14.11.2018
BG14.02.2019
NO14.02.2019
GR15.02.2019
IS14.03.2019
PT14.03.2019
Former [2019/40]AL14.11.2018
AT14.11.2018
CZ14.11.2018
DK14.11.2018
EE14.11.2018
ES14.11.2018
FI14.11.2018
HR14.11.2018
IT14.11.2018
LT14.11.2018
LV14.11.2018
NL14.11.2018
PL14.11.2018
RO14.11.2018
RS14.11.2018
SE14.11.2018
SK14.11.2018
SM14.11.2018
BG14.02.2019
NO14.02.2019
GR15.02.2019
IS14.03.2019
PT14.03.2019
Former [2019/37]AL14.11.2018
AT14.11.2018
CZ14.11.2018
DK14.11.2018
EE14.11.2018
ES14.11.2018
FI14.11.2018
HR14.11.2018
IT14.11.2018
LT14.11.2018
LV14.11.2018
NL14.11.2018
PL14.11.2018
RO14.11.2018
RS14.11.2018
SE14.11.2018
SM14.11.2018
BG14.02.2019
NO14.02.2019
GR15.02.2019
IS14.03.2019
PT14.03.2019
Former [2019/35]AL14.11.2018
AT14.11.2018
CZ14.11.2018
DK14.11.2018
ES14.11.2018
FI14.11.2018
HR14.11.2018
IT14.11.2018
LT14.11.2018
LV14.11.2018
NL14.11.2018
PL14.11.2018
RS14.11.2018
SE14.11.2018
BG14.02.2019
NO14.02.2019
GR15.02.2019
IS14.03.2019
PT14.03.2019
Former [2019/34]AL14.11.2018
AT14.11.2018
DK14.11.2018
ES14.11.2018
FI14.11.2018
HR14.11.2018
IT14.11.2018
LT14.11.2018
LV14.11.2018
NL14.11.2018
RS14.11.2018
SE14.11.2018
BG14.02.2019
NO14.02.2019
GR15.02.2019
IS14.03.2019
PT14.03.2019
Former [2019/26]AL14.11.2018
AT14.11.2018
ES14.11.2018
FI14.11.2018
HR14.11.2018
LT14.11.2018
LV14.11.2018
NL14.11.2018
RS14.11.2018
SE14.11.2018
BG14.02.2019
NO14.02.2019
GR15.02.2019
IS14.03.2019
PT14.03.2019
Former [2019/25]AT14.11.2018
ES14.11.2018
FI14.11.2018
HR14.11.2018
LT14.11.2018
LV14.11.2018
NL14.11.2018
RS14.11.2018
SE14.11.2018
BG14.02.2019
NO14.02.2019
GR15.02.2019
IS14.03.2019
Former [2019/24]AT14.11.2018
ES14.11.2018
FI14.11.2018
HR14.11.2018
LT14.11.2018
LV14.11.2018
NL14.11.2018
SE14.11.2018
BG14.02.2019
NO14.02.2019
GR15.02.2019
IS14.03.2019
Former [2019/23]AT14.11.2018
ES14.11.2018
FI14.11.2018
HR14.11.2018
LT14.11.2018
LV14.11.2018
NL14.11.2018
BG14.02.2019
NO14.02.2019
IS14.03.2019
Former [2019/22]FI14.11.2018
LT14.11.2018
BG14.02.2019
NO14.02.2019
IS14.03.2019
Former [2019/21]FI14.11.2018
LT14.11.2018
NO14.02.2019
IS14.03.2019
Former [2019/20]LT14.11.2018
NO14.02.2019
Documents cited:Search[XY]CN101150598  (ZTE CORP [CN]) [X] 1,7,13 * page 1, paragraph 1 - paragraph 4 * * Step 4; page 2 * * page 3, paragraph 5 * * page 4, paragraph l * [Y] 2-6,8-12;
 [Y]US2011047256  (BABU PRAKASH [IN] ET AL) [Y] 2-6,8-12 * paragraphs [0013] , [0031] , [0042] , [0050] , [0 62] *
International search[X]CN101150598  (ZTE CORP.) [X] 1-13 * , description, page 5, line 4 to page 8, line 10 *;
 [A]CN102299942  (ZTE CORP.) [A] 1-13 * , the whole document *;
 [A]CN102790812  (CHINA UNITED NETWORK COMMUNICATION S CORPORAl ION LIMITED) [A] 1-13 * , the whole document *;
 [A]CN101483672  (SHENZHEN HUAWEI COMMUNICATION TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD.) [A] 1-13 * , the whole document *;
 [A]CN103067268  (HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD.) [A] 1-13 * , the whole document *