Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3171416

EP3171416 - ELECTRODE LAMINATE STRUCTURE ENERGY CONVERSION APPARATUS USING LIQUID [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  21.04.2017
Database last updated on 19.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  13.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip29.06.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Korea Electronics Technology Institute
Yatap-dong
25 Saenari-ro
Bundang-gu
Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do 463-816 / KR
[2017/21]
Inventor(s)01 / KWON, Soon Hyung
c/o KOREA ELECTRONICS TECHNOLOGY INSTITUTE
25 Saenari-ro
Bundang-gu
Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do 463-816 / KR
 [2017/45]
Former [2017/21]01 / KWON, Soon Hyung
c/o KOREA ELECTRONICS TECHNOLOGY INSTITUTE
25 Saenari-ro
Bundang-gu
Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 463-816 / KR
Representative(s)Staeger & Sperling Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Sonnenstraße 19
80331 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2017/21]Peter, Julian
Staeger & Sperling
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Sonnenstrasse 19
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date15821895.810.06.2015
[2017/21]
WO2015KR05838
Priority number, dateKR2014008920215.07.2014         Original published format: KR 20140089202
[2017/21]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016010263
Date:21.01.2016
Language:KO
[2016/03]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3171416
Date:24.05.2017
Language:EN
[2017/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR21.01.2016
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.03.2018
ClassificationInternational:H02N1/08
[2018/15]
Former International [2017/21]H01L41/113
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/21]
TitleGerman:ELEKTRODENLAMINATSTRUKTURENERGIEUMWANDLUNGSVORRICHTUNG MIT VERWENDUNG VON FLÜSSIGKEIT[2017/21]
English:ELECTRODE LAMINATE STRUCTURE ENERGY CONVERSION APPARATUS USING LIQUID[2017/21]
French:APPAREIL DE CONVERSION D'ÉNERGIE À STRUCTURE D'ÉLECTRODE STRATIFIÉE UTILISANT UN LIQUIDE[2017/21]
Entry into regional phase12.01.2017Translation filed 
12.01.2017National basic fee paid 
12.01.2017Search fee paid 
12.01.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
12.01.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.01.2017Examination requested  [2017/21]
12.01.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
14.09.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
27.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
26.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XAI]WO2008147568  (DIGITAL BIOSYSTEMS [US]; WU CHUANYONG [US]) [X] 1-5 * paragraphs [0017] , [0035] , [0036] , [0038] , [0040] * * figures 1A,1B,2A,2B * [A] 6,7 [I] 8,9
International search[XY]KR101411337B  (KOREA ELECTRONICS TECHNOLOGY INSTITUTE) [X] 1, 2, 5-7 * See paragraphs [0032]-[0048], claim 1 and figures 2, 7. * [Y] 3, 4, 8, 9;
 [Y]US7898096  (KRUPENKIN, Thomas Nikita) [Y] 3, 4 * See column 6, line 1-column 15, line 22, claim 1 and figure 1. *;
 [Y]JP2010517755  (COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE) [Y] 4, 8, 9 * See paragraphs [0061]-[0063], claim 1 and figure 3. *;
 [A]KR20140069565  (KOREA ELECTRONICS TECHNOLOGY INSTITUTE et al.) [A] 1-9 * See paragraphs [0041]-[0080], claim 1 and figure 2. *;
 [A]KR20110056867  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.) [A] 1-9 * See paragraphs [0036]-[0057], claim 1 and figure 1. *