Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3170276

EP3170276 - UPLINK DATA TRANSMISSION METHOD IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM AND APPARATUS FOR THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.01.2020
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  08.02.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  05.02.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  26.01.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  03.10.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  21.04.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  07.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.01.2020No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 19.02.2020 [2020/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Electronics Inc.
128, Yeoui-daero
Yeongdeungpo-gu
Seoul 150-721 / KR
[2017/21]
Inventor(s)01 / LEE, Eunjong
LG ELECTRONICS INC.
R&D Campus
19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil
Seocho-gu
Seoul 137-893 / KR
02 / CHUNG, Jaehoon
LG ELECTRONICS INC.
R&D Campus
19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil
Seocho-gu
Seoul 137-893 / KR
03 / HAHN, Genebeck
LG ELECTRONICS INC.
R&D Campus
19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil
Seocho-gu
Seoul 137-893 / KR
04 / KIM, Jinmin
LG ELECTRONICS INC.
R&D Campus
19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil
Seocho-gu
Seoul 137-893 / KR
05 / CHOI, Kukheon
LG ELECTRONICS INC.
R&D Campus
19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil
Seocho-gu
Seoul 137-893 / KR
06 / NOH, Kwangseok
LG ELECTRONICS INC.
R&D Campus
19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil
Seocho-gu
Seoul 137-893 / KR
07 / LEE, Sangrim
LG ELECTRONICS INC.
R&D Campus
19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil
Seocho-gu
Seoul 137-893 / KR
 [2017/21]
Representative(s)Frenkel, Matthias Alexander
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
[2017/21]
Application number, filing date15822248.915.01.2015
[2017/21]
WO2015KR00415
Priority number, dateUS201462026050P18.07.2014         Original published format: US 201462026050 P
[2017/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016010217
Date:21.01.2016
Language:EN
[2016/03]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3170276
Date:24.05.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.2016
[2017/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3170276
Date:13.03.2019
Language:EN
[2019/11]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR21.01.2016
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.01.2018
ClassificationInternational:H04L1/18, H04L5/00
[2017/21]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/21]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:UPLINK-DATENÜBERTRAGUNGSVERFAHREN IN EINEM DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM UND VORRICHTUNG DAFÜR[2017/21]
English:UPLINK DATA TRANSMISSION METHOD IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM AND APPARATUS FOR THE SAME[2017/21]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSMISSION DE DONNÉES DE LIAISON MONTANTE DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL ET APPAREIL ASSOCIÉ[2017/21]
Entry into regional phase07.02.2017National basic fee paid 
07.02.2017Search fee paid 
07.02.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
07.02.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.02.2017Examination requested  [2017/21]
07.02.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
09.08.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.10.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.01.2019Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
25.01.2019Fee for grant paid
25.01.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
05.02.2019Information about intention to grant a patent
05.02.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)16.12.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2020/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
26.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
22.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL13.03.2019
AT13.03.2019
CZ13.03.2019
EE13.03.2019
ES13.03.2019
FI13.03.2019
HR13.03.2019
IT13.03.2019
LT13.03.2019
LV13.03.2019
NL13.03.2019
PL13.03.2019
RO13.03.2019
RS13.03.2019
SE13.03.2019
SK13.03.2019
SM13.03.2019
BG13.06.2019
NO13.06.2019
GR14.06.2019
IS13.07.2019
PT13.07.2019
[2020/04]
Former [2020/03]AL13.03.2019
AT13.03.2019
CZ13.03.2019
EE13.03.2019
ES13.03.2019
FI13.03.2019
HR13.03.2019
IT13.03.2019
LT13.03.2019
LV13.03.2019
NL13.03.2019
PL13.03.2019
RO13.03.2019
RS13.03.2019
SE13.03.2019
SK13.03.2019
SM13.03.2019
BG13.06.2019
NO13.06.2019
GR14.06.2019
PT13.07.2019
Former [2019/52]AL13.03.2019
CZ13.03.2019
EE13.03.2019
ES13.03.2019
FI13.03.2019
HR13.03.2019
IT13.03.2019
LT13.03.2019
LV13.03.2019
NL13.03.2019
PL13.03.2019
RO13.03.2019
RS13.03.2019
SE13.03.2019
SK13.03.2019
SM13.03.2019
BG13.06.2019
NO13.06.2019
GR14.06.2019
PT13.07.2019
Former [2019/51]AL13.03.2019
CZ13.03.2019
EE13.03.2019
ES13.03.2019
FI13.03.2019
HR13.03.2019
IT13.03.2019
LT13.03.2019
LV13.03.2019
NL13.03.2019
RO13.03.2019
RS13.03.2019
SE13.03.2019
SK13.03.2019
SM13.03.2019
BG13.06.2019
NO13.06.2019
GR14.06.2019
PT13.07.2019
Former [2019/49]AL13.03.2019
CZ13.03.2019
EE13.03.2019
ES13.03.2019
FI13.03.2019
HR13.03.2019
IT13.03.2019
LT13.03.2019
LV13.03.2019
NL13.03.2019
RO13.03.2019
RS13.03.2019
SE13.03.2019
SK13.03.2019
BG13.06.2019
NO13.06.2019
GR14.06.2019
PT13.07.2019
Former [2019/48]ES13.03.2019
FI13.03.2019
HR13.03.2019
IT13.03.2019
LT13.03.2019
LV13.03.2019
NL13.03.2019
RS13.03.2019
SE13.03.2019
BG13.06.2019
NO13.06.2019
GR14.06.2019
PT13.07.2019
Former [2019/47]ES13.03.2019
FI13.03.2019
HR13.03.2019
IT13.03.2019
LT13.03.2019
LV13.03.2019
NL13.03.2019
RS13.03.2019
SE13.03.2019
BG13.06.2019
NO13.06.2019
GR14.06.2019
Former [2019/46]FI13.03.2019
HR13.03.2019
IT13.03.2019
LT13.03.2019
LV13.03.2019
NL13.03.2019
RS13.03.2019
SE13.03.2019
BG13.06.2019
NO13.06.2019
GR14.06.2019
Former [2019/39]FI13.03.2019
HR13.03.2019
LT13.03.2019
LV13.03.2019
NL13.03.2019
RS13.03.2019
SE13.03.2019
BG13.06.2019
NO13.06.2019
GR14.06.2019
Former [2019/38]FI13.03.2019
LT13.03.2019
SE13.03.2019
BG13.06.2019
NO13.06.2019
GR14.06.2019
Former [2019/37]FI13.03.2019
LT13.03.2019
SE13.03.2019
NO13.06.2019
GR14.06.2019
Former [2019/34]FI13.03.2019
LT13.03.2019
SE13.03.2019
NO13.06.2019
Former [2019/33]FI13.03.2019
LT13.03.2019
NO13.06.2019
Documents cited:Search[XA]US2012287877  (HAN SEUNG HEE [KR], et al) [X] 1,2,7-10 * paragraph [0177] * * paragraph [0180] * * paragraph [0188] * * paragraph [0203] - paragraph [0204] * * paragraph [0213] - paragraph [0215] * * paragraph [0233] * [A] 3-6;
 [XA]US2012113938  (LARSSON DANIEL [SE], et al) [X] 1,2,7-10 * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0043] * [A] 3-6;
 [XA]  - MEDIATEK, "Discussion on Operations of Contention-based Transmission", 3GPP DRAFT; R2-102208, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20100407), vol. RAN WG2, no. Beijing, china; 20100412, XP050422716 [X] 1,2,7-10 * the whole document * [A] 3-6
International search[Y]US2012213196  (CHUNG JAE HOON [KR], et al) [Y] 1-10 * See paragraphs [0056]-[0223]; and figures 3-21. *;
 [Y]US2012182977  (HOOLI KARI JUHANI [FI], et al) [Y] 1-10 * See paragraphs [0062]-[0111]; and figures 1-5b. *;
 [A]US2013034071  (LEE HYUN WOO [KR], et al) [A] 1-10 * See paragraphs [0106]-[0130]; and figure 7. *;
 [A]US2011263286  (DAMNJANOVIC ALEKSANDAR [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * See paragraphs [0175]-[0182]; and figures 3, 4. *;
 [A]US2013163534  (ANDERSON NICHOLAS WILLIAM [GB], et al) [A] 1-10 * See paragraphs [0075]-[0348]; and figures 7-28. *