Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3171491

EP3171491 - BRUSHLESS WIPER MOTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  25.01.2019
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  21.04.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip03.09.2019New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mitsuba Corporation
2681, Hirosawacho 1-chome
Kiryu-shi, Gunma 376-8555 / JP
[2017/21]
Inventor(s)01 / SHODA, Hirokazu
c/o MITSUBA Corporation
2681 Hirosawacho 1-chome
Kiryu-shi Gunma 376-8555 / JP
02 / ISO, Yukiyoshi
c/o MITSUBA Corporation
2681 Hirosawacho 1-chome
Kiryu-shi Gunma 376-8555 / JP
03 / NAKAMURA, Osamu
c/o MITSUBA Corporation
2681 Hirosawacho 1-chome
Kiryu-shi Gunma 376-8555 / JP
 [2017/21]
Representative(s)Vogel, Andreas , et al
Bals & Vogel Universitätsstrasse 142
44799 Bochum / DE
[2017/21]
Application number, filing date15822886.614.07.2015
[2017/21]
WO2015JP70110
Priority number, dateJP2014014516315.07.2014         Original published format: JP 2014145163
[2017/21]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016010021
Date:21.01.2016
Language:JA
[2016/03]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3171491
Date:24.05.2017
Language:EN
[2017/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP21.01.2016
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.02.2018
ClassificationInternational:H02K7/116, B60S1/08, H02K29/08, H02K7/08, H02K11/215
[2018/12]
Former International [2017/21]H02K7/116, B60S1/08, H02K29/08
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/21]
TitleGerman:BÜRSTENLOSER WISCHERMOTOR[2017/21]
English:BRUSHLESS WIPER MOTOR[2017/21]
French:MOTEUR D'ESSUIE-GLACE SANS BALAIS[2017/21]
Entry into regional phase28.12.2016Translation filed 
15.02.2017National basic fee paid 
15.02.2017Search fee paid 
15.02.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
15.02.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.05.2016Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
28.12.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
15.02.2017Examination requested  [2017/21]
10.09.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.01.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.05.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.09.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
31.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
15.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XI]EP0943842  (MANNESMANN VDO AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,5 * paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0024] * * figure 1 * [I] 3,4,6,7;
 [I]WO9718120  (LUCAS IND PLC [GB], et al) [I] 1-3,7 * page 2, line 2 - line 3 * * page 5, line 9 - line 14 * * page 5, line 25 - page 6, line 7 * * claims 1, 2, 7 * * figure 2 *;
 [I]WO2011079982  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [I] 1,2,6,7 * abstract * * page 3, line 26 - page 5, line 3 * * claims 1-4, 6, 7 * * figure 1 *
International search[XY]US2013015739  (KASTINGER GUENTER [DE], et al) [X] 1-2, 6 * , entire text; all drawings & WO 2011/079982 A2 & DE 102009055396 A1 & CN 102668339 A * [Y] 3-5, 7;
 [XY]JP2013538744  (ZF Lenksysteme GmbH) [X] 1-5 * , entire text; all drawings & US 2013/0213727 A1 & WO 2012/041693 A1 & DE 102010041744 A1 & CN 103124666 A * [Y] 6-7;
 [XY]JP2005168099  (KOYO SEIKO CO) [X] 1-5 * , entire text; all drawings & US 2005/0116561 A1 & US 2007/0235248 A1 & EP 1535825 A2 & KR 10-2005-0052389 A * [Y] 6-7;
 [XY]JP2000500102  (Lucas Industries PLC) [X] 1-5 * , entire text; all drawings & US 6194849 B1 & US 6211631 B1 & WO 1998/010971 A1 * [Y] 6-7;
 [Y]WO2008117728  (NSK LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 6-7 * , entire text; all drawings & JP 5141681 B2 *;
 [Y]JP2008253049  (MITSUBA CORP) [Y] 6-7 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *;
 [Y]JP2011244562  (MITSUBA CORP) [Y] 6-7 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *