Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3233267

EP3233267 - COATED MICROCAPSULES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.09.2017
Database last updated on 12.12.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  14.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip11.09.2018Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Noxell Corporation
11050 York Road
Hunt Valley, Maryland 21030-2098 / US
[2017/45]
Former [2017/43]For all designated states
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
Inventor(s)01 / TASKER, Alison, Louise
St Lucia
Brisbane, Queensland 4072 / AU
02 / BAXTER, Elaine, Alice Marie
Whitehall Lane
Rusham Park
Egham Surrey TW20 9NW / GB
03 / BIGGS, Simon, Richard
St Lucia
Brisbane, Queensland 4072 / AU
04 / CAYRE, Olivier, Jean
University of Leeds
Woodhouse Lane
Leeds Yorkshire LS2 9JT / GB
05 / HITCHCOCK, James, Paul
4 Stone Villas
Leeds Yorkshire LS2 4AA / GB
 [2017/46]
Former [2017/43]01 / TASKER, Alison, Louise
St Lucia
Brisbane, Queensland 4072 / AU
02 / BAXTER, Elaine, Alice Marie
Whitehall Lane
Rusham Park
Egham Surrey TW20 9NW / GB
03 / BIGGS, Simon, Richard
St Lucia
Brisbane, Queensland 4072 / AU
04 / CAYRE, Olivier, Jean
211 Clarendon Road
Leeds Yorkshire LS2 9JT / GB
05 / HITCHCOCK, James, Paul
211 Clarendon Road
Leeds Yorkshire LS2 9JT / GB
Representative(s)Bandpay & Greuter
30, rue Notre-Dame des Victoires
75002 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2017/43]Vidon Brevets & Stratégie
16B, rue de Jouanet
B.P. 90333
Technopole Atalante
35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR
Application number, filing date15823077.116.12.2015
[2017/43]
WO2015US66067
Priority number, dateUS201462092663P16.12.2014         Original published format: US 201462092663 P
[2017/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016100499
Date:23.06.2016
Language:EN
[2016/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3233267
Date:25.10.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.2016
[2017/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.06.2016
ClassificationInternational:B01J13/22, A01N25/28, A61K9/50, C09B67/02, C11D3/50
[2017/43]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/43]
TitleGerman:ÜBERZOGENE MIKROKAPSELN[2017/43]
English:COATED MICROCAPSULES[2017/43]
French:MICROCAPSULES ENROBÉES[2017/43]
Entry into regional phase13.07.2017National basic fee paid 
13.07.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
13.07.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.07.2017Examination requested  [2017/43]
13.07.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
12.04.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[I]WO2010003762  (BASF SE [DE], et al) [I] 1-15 * claims 1, 7-8 *;
 [A]WO2009037482  (UNIV LEEDS [GB], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2005057163  (UNIV RICE WILLIAM M [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2014058079  (TEIJIN LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
by applicantUS5578563
 US2730456
 US2800457
 US2800458
 US4552811
 US6592990
 US2006263518
 US3516941
 US5066419
 US5154842
 WO2014047496
    - LOXLEY ET AL., JOURNAL OF COLLOID AND INTERFACE SCIENCE, (1998), vol. 208, pages 49 - 62
    - BASARIR ET AL., ACS APPLIED MATERIALS & INTERFACES, (2012), vol. 4, no. 3, pages 1324 - 1329
    - BLAKE ET AL., LANGMUIR, (2010), vol. 26, no. 3, pages 1533 - 1538
    - CHEN ET AL., JOURNAL OF PHYSICAL CHEMISTRY C, (2008), vol. 112, no. 24, pages 8870 - 8874
    - FUJIWARA ET AL., JOURNAL OF THE ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY, (2010), vol. 157, no. 4, pages D211 - D216
    - GUO ET AL., JOURNAL OF APPLIED POLYMER SCIENCE, (2013), vol. 127, no. 5, pages 4186 - 4193
    - HAAG ET AL., SURFACE AND COATINGS TECHNOLOGY, (2006), vol. 201, no. 6, pages 2166 - 2173
    - HORIUCHI ET AL., SURFACE & COATINGS TECHNOLOGY, (2010), vol. 204, no. 23, pages 3811 - 3817
    - KO ET AL., JOURNAL OF THE ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY, (2010), vol. 157, no. 1, pages D46 - D49
    - LIN ET AL., INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF HYDROGEN ENERGY, (2010), vol. 35, no. 14, pages 7555 - 7562
    - LIU ET AL., LANGMUIR, (2005), vol. 21, no. 5, pages 1683 - 1686
    - MA ET AL., APPLIED SURFACE SCIENCE, (2012), vol. 258, no. 19, pages 7774 - 7780
    - MIYOSHI ET AL., COLLOIDS AND SURFACES A: PHYSICOCHEMICAL AND ENGINEERING ASPECTS, (2008), vol. 321, no. 1-3, pages 238 - 243
    - MOON ET AL., ULTRAMICROSCOPY, (2008), vol. 108, no. 10, pages 1307 - 1310
    - WU ET AL., JOURNAL OF COLLOID AND INTERFACE SCIENCE, (2009), vol. 330, no. 2, pages 359 - 366
    - YE ET AL., MATERIALS LETTERS, (2008), vol. 62, no. 4-5, pages 666 - 669
    - ZHU ET AL., SURFACE AND COATINGS TECHNOLOGY, (2011), vol. 205, no. 8-9, pages 2985 - 2988