Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3397923

EP3397923 - IMPROVED SURVEYING POLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  26.04.2019
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  03.03.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  05.10.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  07.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip24.01.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CZ, DK
published on 26.02.2020 [2020/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fundació Centre Tecnologic de Telecomunicacions de Catalunya (CTTC)
Av. Carl Friedrich Gauss, 7
08860 Castelldefels (Barcelona) / ES
[2018/45]
Inventor(s)01 / PARÉS CALAF, M. Eulàlia
Av. Carl Friedrich Gauss 7
08860 Castelldefels (BARCELONA) / ES
02 / CALERO SCANLAN, David
Av. Carl Friedrich Gauss 7
08860 Castelldefels (BARCELONA) / ES
03 / FERNÁNDEZ MURCIA, Enric
Av. Carl Friedrich Gauss 7
08860 Castelldefels (BARCELONA) / ES
 [2018/45]
Representative(s)Mohammadian, Dario
KUKATI
Apartado de Correos 34031
08080 Barcelona / ES
[2018/45]
Application number, filing date15823178.730.12.2015
[2018/45]
WO2015EP81433
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017114577
Date:06.07.2017
Language:EN
[2017/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3397923
Date:07.11.2018
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.07.2017
[2018/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3397923
Date:29.05.2019
Language:EN
[2019/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.07.2017
ClassificationInternational:G01C15/06
[2018/45]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/45]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERBESSERTER VERMESSUNGSSTAB[2018/45]
English:IMPROVED SURVEYING POLE[2018/45]
French:MIRE AMÉLIORÉE[2018/45]
Entry into regional phase11.07.2018National basic fee paid 
11.07.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
11.07.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.07.2017Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
11.07.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.07.2018Examination requested  [2018/45]
11.07.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
04.03.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.04.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
16.04.2019Fee for grant paid
16.04.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
19.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL29.05.2019
CZ29.05.2019
DK29.05.2019
FI29.05.2019
HR29.05.2019
LT29.05.2019
LV29.05.2019
NL29.05.2019
RS29.05.2019
BG29.08.2019
NO29.08.2019
GR30.08.2019
PT30.09.2019
[2020/09]
Former [2020/07]AL29.05.2019
FI29.05.2019
HR29.05.2019
LT29.05.2019
LV29.05.2019
NL29.05.2019
RS29.05.2019
BG29.08.2019
NO29.08.2019
GR30.08.2019
PT30.09.2019
Former [2019/51]AL29.05.2019
FI29.05.2019
HR29.05.2019
LT29.05.2019
LV29.05.2019
RS29.05.2019
BG29.08.2019
NO29.08.2019
GR30.08.2019
PT30.09.2019
Former [2019/50]AL29.05.2019
FI29.05.2019
HR29.05.2019
LT29.05.2019
LV29.05.2019
RS29.05.2019
NO29.08.2019
GR30.08.2019
PT30.09.2019
Former [2019/48]FI29.05.2019
LT29.05.2019
NO29.08.2019
PT30.09.2019
Former [2019/47]FI29.05.2019
LT29.05.2019
NO29.08.2019
Cited inInternational search[I]US2009024325  (SCHERZINGER BRUNO M [CA]) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0013] - [0014] *;
 [I]EP2722647  (LEICA GEOSYSTEMS AG [CH]) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0017] , [0044] , [0049] *;
 [A]US5929807  (VINEY IAN TIMOTHY [NZ], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 2, line 40 - column 3, line 16 *