EP3230242 - BATCH PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF CIS-2,2,4,4-TETRAMETHYLCYCLOBUTANE-1,3-DIOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.06.2018 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.08.2018 [2018/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Chemical Company 200 South Wilcox Drive Kingsport, TN 37660 / US | [2017/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STAVINOHA, Jerome Leonard Jr. 204 Terese Drive Longview, TX 75605 / US | 02 /
ASHCROFT, Carey Dan 1407 Walter Drive Longview, TX 75605 / US | 03 /
HOYME, Craig Alan 104 Rosecliff Drive Fall Branch, TN 37656 / US | 04 /
KELLY, Kelmara Khadene 110 W Park Drive Kingsport, TN 37660-3806 / US | [2017/42] | Representative(s) | Ricker, Mathias Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Zweibrückenstraße 5-7 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/42] | Ricker, Mathias Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Zweibrückenstrasse 5-7 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15823856.8 | 09.12.2015 | [2017/42] | WO2015US64624 | Priority number, date | US201414566245 | 10.12.2014 Original published format: US201414566245 | [2017/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016094479 | Date: | 16.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3230242 | Date: | 18.10.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.06.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C07C29/56, C07C29/145, C07C35/04 | [2017/42] | CPC: |
C07C29/145 (EP,CN,US);
C07C29/56 (EP,CN,US);
C07B2200/09 (EP,CN,US);
C07C2601/04 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C29/145, C07C35/045 (US,CN,EP);
C07C29/56, C07C35/045 (CN,EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/42] | Title | German: | CHARGENVERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON CIS-2,2,4,4-TETRAMETHYLCYCLOBUTAN-1,3-DIOL | [2017/42] | English: | BATCH PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF CIS-2,2,4,4-TETRAMETHYLCYCLOBUTANE-1,3-DIOL | [2017/42] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DISCONTINU POUR LA PRÉPARATION DE CIS-2,2,4,4-TÉTRAMÉTHYLCYCLOBUTANE-1,3-DIOL | [2017/42] | Entry into regional phase | 29.05.2017 | National basic fee paid | 29.05.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.05.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/42] | 29.05.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/31] | 09.03.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2018/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]WO2012078439 (EASTMAN CHEM CO [US]) [I] 1-20 * the whole document * | by applicant | US3190928 | US3000906 | US5169994 | US5258556 | US2936324 | US5528556 | US7115239 | US2009208391 | US2008176069 | US2008175787 | US2006239893 | US2006142149 | US2006142148 | US2003039604 | - ROSSETTI ET AL., CATALYSIS TODAY, (2005), vol. 102-103, pages 219 - 224 |