Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3172570

EP3172570 - ANALYTE TEST STRIP ASSAYS, AND TEST STRIPS AND KITS FOR USE IN PRACTICING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  21.09.2018
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  28.04.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  01.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip22.11.2019New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Becton, Dickinson and Company
1 Becton Drive, Mail Code 110
Franklin Lakes, NJ 07417-1880 / US
[2017/22]
Inventor(s)01 / PETISCE, James Raymond
8 Lakeside Terrace
Westford, MA 01886 / US
 [2017/22]
Representative(s)Vogel, Andreas , et al
Bals & Vogel Universitätsstrasse 142
44799 Bochum / DE
[2017/22]
Application number, filing date15824776.710.06.2015
[2017/22]
WO2015US35169
Priority number, dateUS201462029388P25.07.2014         Original published format: US 201462029388 P
[2017/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016014162
Date:28.01.2016
Language:EN
[2016/04]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3172570
Date:31.05.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.01.2016
[2017/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR28.01.2016
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.11.2017
ClassificationInternational:G01N33/66, G01N33/543
[2017/22]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/22]
TitleGerman:ANALYTTESTSTREIFENASSAYS UND TESTSTREIFEN UND KITS ZUR VERWENDUNG BEIM ÜBEN DAVON[2017/22]
English:ANALYTE TEST STRIP ASSAYS, AND TEST STRIPS AND KITS FOR USE IN PRACTICING THE SAME[2017/22]
French:DOSAGES D'ANALYTE À L'AIDE DE BANDELETTES RÉACTIVES, BANDELETTES RÉACTIVES ET KITS D'UTILISATION DE CELLES-CI[2017/22]
Entry into regional phase27.02.2017National basic fee paid 
27.02.2017Search fee paid 
27.02.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
27.02.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.09.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
27.02.2017Examination requested  [2017/22]
20.04.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.09.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.01.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.03.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.07.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.09.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
20.11.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.11.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
22.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
21.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XI]WO03007814  (AGILEX BIOSCIENCES INC [US], et al) [X] 1-12 * abstract * [I] 13-15;
 [Y]EP1380829  (SAPPORO IMMUNO DIAGNOSTIC LAB [JP]) [Y] 1-15 * abstract *;
 [Y]WO2005031351  (OAKVILLE TRADING HONG KONG LTD [CN], et al) [Y] 1-15 * abstract *;
 [Y]WO0157239  (LIFESCAN INC [US]) [Y] 1-15 * p 8, last full para *
 [Y]  - DANIEL MALAMUD, "Saliva as a Diagnostic Fluid", DENTAL CLINICS OF NORTH AMERICA., US, (20110101), vol. 55, no. 1, doi:10.1016/j.cden.2010.08.004, ISSN 0011-8532, pages 159 - 178, XP055423879 [Y] 1-15 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cden.2010.08.004
International search[Y]US2005079629  (GUO, H. et al.) [Y] 1-7, 11-15 * See paragraph [0023]; claims 1, 8-9, 14 and 22-26; figures 1-2. *;
 [Y]US2002068860  (CLARK, JR., L. C.) [Y] 1-7, 11-15 * See paragraph [0068]; claims 1 and 12-14; figures 1-2. *;
 [Y]US2012282636  (ALTSCHUL, R. L. et al.) [Y] 1-7, 11-15 * See claims 1, 9-14 and 30; figures 1-3. *;
 [Y]US2011015546  (MONDRO, J. et al.) [Y] 1-7, 11-15 * See claims 1 and 14; figures 1-3. *;
 [Y]US2011015545  (MONDRO, J.) [Y] 1-7, 11-15 * See claims 1-3; figures 1 and 3. *