Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3231229

EP3231229 - ENHANCED SYSTEM ACCESS FOR E-UTRAN [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.01.2020
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  01.02.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  18.09.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  30.03.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.09.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  25.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip24.01.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): DK
published on 26.02.2020 [2020/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
[2017/42]
Inventor(s)01 / OZTURK, Ozcan
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
02 / WANG, Jun
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
03 / VAJAPEYAM, Madhavan, Srinivasan
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
04 / PATWARDHAN, Ravindra, Manohar
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
 [2017/42]
Representative(s)Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[2017/42]
Application number, filing date15825687.509.12.2015
[2017/42]
WO2015US64754
Priority number, dateUS201462089664P09.12.2014         Original published format: US 201462089664 P
US20151496246808.12.2015         Original published format: US201514962468
[2017/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2016094537
Date:16.06.2016
Language:EN
[2016/24]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP3231229
Date:18.10.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.06.2016
[2017/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3231229
Date:06.03.2019
Language:EN
[2019/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.08.2016
ClassificationInternational:H04W68/02, // H04W8/22, H04W48/12
[2018/39]
Former International [2017/42]H04W68/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/42]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ERWEITERTER SYSTEMZUGANG FÜR E-UTRAN[2017/42]
English:ENHANCED SYSTEM ACCESS FOR E-UTRAN[2017/42]
French:ACCÈS SYSTÈME AMÉLIORÉ DESTINÉ À UN E-UTRAN[2017/42]
Entry into regional phase24.04.2017National basic fee paid 
24.04.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
24.04.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.04.2017Examination requested  [2017/42]
24.04.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
29.01.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.04.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.08.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.09.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.01.2019Fee for grant paid
18.01.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
18.01.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)09.12.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2020/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
10.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL06.03.2019
AT06.03.2019
CZ06.03.2019
DK06.03.2019
EE06.03.2019
ES06.03.2019
FI06.03.2019
HR06.03.2019
IT06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
LV06.03.2019
NL06.03.2019
PL06.03.2019
RO06.03.2019
RS06.03.2019
SE06.03.2019
SK06.03.2019
SM06.03.2019
BG06.06.2019
NO06.06.2019
GR07.06.2019
IS06.07.2019
PT06.07.2019
[2020/09]
Former [2020/04]AL06.03.2019
AT06.03.2019
CZ06.03.2019
EE06.03.2019
ES06.03.2019
FI06.03.2019
HR06.03.2019
IT06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
LV06.03.2019
NL06.03.2019
PL06.03.2019
RO06.03.2019
RS06.03.2019
SE06.03.2019
SK06.03.2019
SM06.03.2019
BG06.06.2019
NO06.06.2019
GR07.06.2019
IS06.07.2019
PT06.07.2019
Former [2020/03]AL06.03.2019
AT06.03.2019
CZ06.03.2019
EE06.03.2019
ES06.03.2019
FI06.03.2019
HR06.03.2019
IT06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
LV06.03.2019
NL06.03.2019
PL06.03.2019
RO06.03.2019
RS06.03.2019
SE06.03.2019
SK06.03.2019
SM06.03.2019
BG06.06.2019
NO06.06.2019
GR07.06.2019
PT06.07.2019
Former [2019/52]AL06.03.2019
CZ06.03.2019
EE06.03.2019
ES06.03.2019
FI06.03.2019
HR06.03.2019
IT06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
LV06.03.2019
NL06.03.2019
PL06.03.2019
RO06.03.2019
RS06.03.2019
SE06.03.2019
SK06.03.2019
SM06.03.2019
BG06.06.2019
NO06.06.2019
GR07.06.2019
PT06.07.2019
Former [2019/51]AL06.03.2019
CZ06.03.2019
EE06.03.2019
ES06.03.2019
FI06.03.2019
HR06.03.2019
IT06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
LV06.03.2019
NL06.03.2019
RO06.03.2019
RS06.03.2019
SE06.03.2019
SK06.03.2019
SM06.03.2019
BG06.06.2019
NO06.06.2019
GR07.06.2019
PT06.07.2019
Former [2019/49]AL06.03.2019
CZ06.03.2019
EE06.03.2019
ES06.03.2019
FI06.03.2019
HR06.03.2019
IT06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
LV06.03.2019
NL06.03.2019
RO06.03.2019
RS06.03.2019
SE06.03.2019
SK06.03.2019
BG06.06.2019
NO06.06.2019
GR07.06.2019
PT06.07.2019
Former [2019/48]ES06.03.2019
FI06.03.2019
HR06.03.2019
IT06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
LV06.03.2019
NL06.03.2019
RS06.03.2019
SE06.03.2019
BG06.06.2019
NO06.06.2019
GR07.06.2019
PT06.07.2019
Former [2019/47]ES06.03.2019
FI06.03.2019
HR06.03.2019
IT06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
LV06.03.2019
NL06.03.2019
RS06.03.2019
SE06.03.2019
BG06.06.2019
NO06.06.2019
GR07.06.2019
Former [2019/46]FI06.03.2019
HR06.03.2019
IT06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
LV06.03.2019
NL06.03.2019
RS06.03.2019
SE06.03.2019
BG06.06.2019
NO06.06.2019
GR07.06.2019
Former [2019/39]FI06.03.2019
HR06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
LV06.03.2019
NL06.03.2019
RS06.03.2019
SE06.03.2019
BG06.06.2019
NO06.06.2019
GR07.06.2019
Former [2019/38]FI06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
SE06.03.2019
BG06.06.2019
NO06.06.2019
GR07.06.2019
Former [2019/37]FI06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
SE06.03.2019
NO06.06.2019
GR07.06.2019
Former [2019/34]FI06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
SE06.03.2019
NO06.06.2019
Former [2019/33]FI06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
NO06.06.2019
Cited inInternational search[XI]US2005014519  (SINNARAJAH RAGULAN [CA], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6,12-15,20,21,23-25,31,33,34,39,40,42-44,50-53,58,59 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] - [0006] - [0030] , [0046] - [0053]; claims 1,11 * [I] 3,7-11,15-19,22,26-30,32,34-38,41,45-49,53-57;
 [A]WO2014089985  (ZTE CORP [CN]) [A] 1-59 * abstract *;
 [P]EP2930998  (ZTE CORP [CN]) [P] * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0007] , [0014] , [0019] , [0032] , [0049] , [0065]; figures 2,3,4; claims 1,6,7 *;
 [A]US2012058764  (KANG HYUN-JEONG [KR], et al) [A] 1-59 * abstract * * paragraphs [0007] , [0045] , [0049] , [0 72] , [0091] , [0112] *;
 [A]US2014094201  (KNAUFT JAMES P [US], et al) [A] 1-59 * abstract * * paragraphs [0012] - [0014] - [0017] , [0020] , [0031] - [0032]; figure 6; claims 1,10, 19 *;
 [A]US2012195275  (GHAUS MOHAMMAD [US], et al) [A] 1-59 * abstract * * paragraphs [0009] - [0013] - [0059]; figure 3B *;
 [A]  - SIEMENS, "Adaptive DRX Setting for LTE paging", 3GPP DRAFT; R2-062818, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20061005), vol. RAN WG2, no. Seoul, Korea; 20061005, XP050132343 [A] 1-59 * the whole document *