Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3049733

EP3049733 - FLUID HEATER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.08.2018
Database last updated on 18.06.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  25.08.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  04.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip03.08.2018No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 05.09.2018  [2018/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rossi, Andrea
1331 Lincoln Road
Apt 601
Miami Beach, Florida 33139 / US
[2016/31]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2016/31]
Representative(s)Farago-Schauer, Peter Andreas
FARAGO Patentanwälte
Thierschstrasse 11
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2017/39]Farago, Peter Andreas
FARAGO Patentanwälte
Thierschstrasse 11
80538 München / DE
Former [2016/31]Farago, Peter Andreas
Schieber Farago
Thierschstrasse 11
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date15827258.328.07.2015
[2016/31]
WO2015US42353
Priority number, dateUS201461999582P01.08.2014         Original published format: US 201461999582 P
[2016/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016018851
Date:04.02.2016
Language:EN
[2016/05]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3049733
Date:03.08.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.02.2016
[2016/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3049733
Date:27.09.2017
Language:EN
[2017/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US04.02.2016
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.02.2017
ClassificationInternational:F24J1/00
[2016/31]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/31]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
TitleGerman:FLÜSSIGKEITSERHITZER[2016/31]
English:FLUID HEATER[2016/31]
French:DISPOSITIF CHAUFFANT POUR FLUIDE[2016/31]
Entry into regional phase27.04.2016National basic fee paid 
27.04.2016Search fee paid 
27.04.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
27.04.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.03.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.04.2016Examination requested  [2016/31]
05.07.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.08.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
17.08.2017Fee for grant paid
17.08.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)28.06.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[A]US2008131316  (ECKELS J DEL [US], et al) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0006] , [0030] , [0040]; figure - *;
 [A]US2010226829  (HORIGUCHI TOSHIO [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0042]; figures 2A,B *;
 [A]US2004234699  (HALE RON L [US], et al) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0070] , [0083] , [0090]; figure 1A * * paragraph [0211] - paragraph [0212]; figure 11B *;
 [A]US2010252023  (COFFEY BRENDAN [US], et al) [A] 1 * paragraph [0060]; figure 9 *;
 [A]US2011005506  (ROSSI ANDREA [IT]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0056] *
International search[XY]US2012122017  (MILLS RANDELL L [US]) [X] 29, 32-35 * entire document * [Y] 1-18, 30, 31, 36;
 [Y]US2010252023  (COFFEY BRENDAN [US], et al) [Y] 1-18 * entire document *;
 [Y]US3083526  (HUDSON PAUL S) [Y] 5, 30, 31, 36 * entire document *;
 [Y]US5770838  (ROHRBAUGH DAVID S [US], et al) [Y] 3 * entire document *;
 [Y]US2014147361  (KREMER JR ROBERT [DE], et al) [Y] 4 * entire document *;
 [Y]US2004065314  (LAYER JAMES H [US], et al) [Y] 17, 18 * entire document *;
 [A]US2011005506  (ROSSI ANDREA [IT]) [A] 1-36 * entire document *