Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3230582

EP3230582 - APPARATUS FOR CONVERTING WAVE ENERGY INTO ELECTRICAL ENERGY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  07.12.2018
Database last updated on 20.08.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  19.07.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.09.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  29.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BG
published on 18.09.2019 [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Grosso, Gilles
58 Boucle de la Malogineste
83140 Six-Fours-les-Plages / FR
[2017/42]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2017/42]
Representative(s)Roman, Alexis
Cabinet Roman
35 rue Paradis
B.P. 30064
13484 Marseille Cedex 20 / FR
[2017/42]
Application number, filing date15828344.030.11.2015
[2017/42]
WO2015FR53257
Priority number, dateFR2014006169401.12.2014         Original published format: FR 1461694
[2017/42]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016087757
Date:09.06.2016
Language:FR
[2016/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3230582
Date:18.10.2017
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.06.2016
[2017/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3230582
Date:09.01.2019
Language:FR
[2019/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP09.06.2016
ClassificationInternational:F03B13/18, H02N2/18, H01L41/113
[2017/42]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/42]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUR UMWANDLUNG VON WELLENENERGIE IN ELEKTRISCHE ENERGIE[2017/42]
English:APPARATUS FOR CONVERTING WAVE ENERGY INTO ELECTRICAL ENERGY[2017/42]
French:APPAREIL POUR CONVERTIR UNE ÉNERGIE DE HOULE EN ÉNERGIE ÉLECTRIQUE[2017/42]
Entry into regional phase30.06.2017National basic fee paid 
30.06.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
30.06.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.06.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
30.06.2017Examination requested  [2017/42]
20.07.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.11.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
16.11.2018Fee for grant paid
16.11.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES09.01.2019
FI09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
NL09.01.2019
PL09.01.2019
SE09.01.2019
BG09.04.2019
GR10.04.2019
PT09.05.2019
[2019/38]
Former [2019/37]ES09.01.2019
FI09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
NL09.01.2019
PL09.01.2019
SE09.01.2019
GR10.04.2019
PT09.05.2019
Former [2019/35]ES09.01.2019
FI09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
NL09.01.2019
PL09.01.2019
SE09.01.2019
PT09.05.2019
Former [2019/34]FI09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
NL09.01.2019
SE09.01.2019
PT09.05.2019
Former [2019/33]FI09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
NL09.01.2019
PT09.05.2019
Former [2019/30]NL09.01.2019
Cited inInternational search[A]US4685296  (BURNS JOSEPH R [US]) [A] 1-14 * column 4, line 32 - column 5, line 20; figure 2 *;
 [A]US2012104761  (VAMVAS VASSILIOS [US]) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0040] , [0044] , [0045] , [0059] - [0064]; figures 4a-4d *;
 [A]US2011260582  (LEE HSIEN-HUA [TW], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0012]; figure - *;
 [A]GB2091815  (DAVY LOEWY LTD) [A] 1-14 * page 1, line 49 - page 2, line 4; figure - *;
 [A]US6194815  (CARROLL CHARLES B [US]) [A] 1-14 * abstract *
by applicantUS7355293
 US8456030
 EP2284386
 US4685296
 US2012104761
    - THIAM, A.G.; PIERCE, A.D., "Feasibility of using Piezoelectric in the conversion of ocean wave energy", FIRST ANNUAL MREC TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE