Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3238439

EP3238439 - METHODS OF MANUFACTURING LARGE-SCALE ELECTRONIC DISPLAYS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2017/44]LARGE-SCALE ELECTRONIC DISPLAYS AND METHODS OF MANUFACTURING THE SAME
[2018/26]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.10.2019
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  26.10.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  07.06.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  29.09.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  14.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.01.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Amscreen Group Limited
Amscreen House Paragon Business Park Chorley New Road Horwich Bolton
Lancashire BL6 6HG / GB
[2017/44]
Inventor(s)01 / WHITEHEAD, Stephen
c/o Amscreen Group Limited
Amscreeen House
Paragon Business Park
Chorley New Road, Horwich
Bolton, Lancashire BL6 6HG / GB
02 / SHIRES, Jonathan
c/o Amscreen Group Limited
Amscreeen House
Paragon Business Park
Chorley New Road, Horwich
Bolton, Lancashire BL6 6HG / GB
03 / GREENWOOD, Gary
c/o Amscreen Group Limited
Amscreeen House
Paragon Business Park
Chorley New Road, Horwich
Bolton, Lancashire BL6 6HG / GB
 [2017/44]
Representative(s)Stanley, David William
Stanleys
Intellectual Property
Suite LP44050
20-22 Wenlock Road
London, N1 7GU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2018/48]Stanley, David William
Stanleys
Intellectual Property
Parkshot House
5 Kew Road
Richmond, TW9 2PR / GB
Former [2017/44]Stanley, David William
Stanleys
Intellectual Property
Gainsborough House
2 Sheen Road
Richmond, TW9 1AE / GB
Application number, filing date15828837.324.12.2015
[2017/44]
WO2015GB54167
Priority number, dateGB2014002323324.12.2014         Original published format: GB 201423233
[2017/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016102980
Date:30.06.2016
Language:EN
[2016/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3238439
Date:01.11.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.06.2016
[2017/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3238439
Date:28.11.2018
Language:EN
[2018/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.06.2016
ClassificationInternational:B66C1/66, E05D15/44, E05F1/10, G09F27/00, H04N5/64
[2018/22]
Former International [2017/44]H04N5/64
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/44]
Former [2017/44]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON GROSSFLÄCHIGEN ELEKTRONISCHEN ANZEIGEN[2018/26]
English:METHODS OF MANUFACTURING LARGE-SCALE ELECTRONIC DISPLAYS[2018/26]
French:PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION D'AFFICHEURS ÉLECTRONIQUES À GRANDE ÉCHELLE[2018/26]
Former [2017/44]GROSSFLÄCHIGE ELEKTRONISCHE ANZEIGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON
Former [2017/44]LARGE-SCALE ELECTRONIC DISPLAYS AND METHODS OF MANUFACTURING THE SAME
Former [2017/44]DISPOSITIFS D'AFFICHAGE ÉLECTRONIQUES À GRANDE ÉCHELLE ET PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION CORRESPONDANTS
Entry into regional phase24.07.2017National basic fee paid 
24.07.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
24.07.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.07.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.07.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
24.07.2017Examination requested  [2017/44]
08.06.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.10.2018Fee for grant paid
09.10.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
09.10.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)29.08.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL28.11.2018
AT28.11.2018
CZ28.11.2018
DK28.11.2018
EE28.11.2018
ES28.11.2018
FI28.11.2018
HR28.11.2018
IT28.11.2018
LT28.11.2018
LV28.11.2018
MC28.11.2018
NL28.11.2018
PL28.11.2018
RO28.11.2018
RS28.11.2018
SI28.11.2018
SK28.11.2018
SM28.11.2018
IE24.12.2018
LU24.12.2018
MT24.12.2018
CH31.12.2018
LI31.12.2018
BG28.02.2019
NO28.02.2019
GR01.03.2019
IS28.03.2019
PT28.03.2019
[2020/08]
Former [2020/04]AL28.11.2018
AT28.11.2018
CZ28.11.2018
DK28.11.2018
EE28.11.2018
ES28.11.2018
FI28.11.2018
HR28.11.2018
IT28.11.2018
LT28.11.2018
LV28.11.2018
MC28.11.2018
NL28.11.2018
PL28.11.2018
RO28.11.2018
RS28.11.2018
SI28.11.2018
SK28.11.2018
SM28.11.2018
IE24.12.2018
LU24.12.2018
CH31.12.2018
LI31.12.2018
BG28.02.2019
NO28.02.2019
GR01.03.2019
IS28.03.2019
PT28.03.2019
Former [2019/50]AL28.11.2018
AT28.11.2018
CZ28.11.2018
DK28.11.2018
EE28.11.2018
ES28.11.2018
FI28.11.2018
HR28.11.2018
IT28.11.2018
LT28.11.2018
LV28.11.2018
MC28.11.2018
NL28.11.2018
PL28.11.2018
RO28.11.2018
RS28.11.2018
SI28.11.2018
SK28.11.2018
SM28.11.2018
IE24.12.2018
LU24.12.2018
BG28.02.2019
NO28.02.2019
GR01.03.2019
IS28.03.2019
PT28.03.2019
Former [2019/48]AL28.11.2018
AT28.11.2018
CZ28.11.2018
DK28.11.2018
EE28.11.2018
ES28.11.2018
FI28.11.2018
HR28.11.2018
IT28.11.2018
LT28.11.2018
LV28.11.2018
MC28.11.2018
NL28.11.2018
PL28.11.2018
RO28.11.2018
RS28.11.2018
SK28.11.2018
SM28.11.2018
IE24.12.2018
LU24.12.2018
BG28.02.2019
NO28.02.2019
GR01.03.2019
IS28.03.2019
PT28.03.2019
Former [2019/40]AL28.11.2018
AT28.11.2018
CZ28.11.2018
DK28.11.2018
EE28.11.2018
ES28.11.2018
FI28.11.2018
HR28.11.2018
IT28.11.2018
LT28.11.2018
LV28.11.2018
MC28.11.2018
NL28.11.2018
PL28.11.2018
RO28.11.2018
RS28.11.2018
SK28.11.2018
SM28.11.2018
LU24.12.2018
BG28.02.2019
NO28.02.2019
GR01.03.2019
IS28.03.2019
PT28.03.2019
Former [2019/39]AL28.11.2018
AT28.11.2018
CZ28.11.2018
DK28.11.2018
EE28.11.2018
ES28.11.2018
FI28.11.2018
HR28.11.2018
IT28.11.2018
LT28.11.2018
LV28.11.2018
NL28.11.2018
PL28.11.2018
RO28.11.2018
RS28.11.2018
SK28.11.2018
SM28.11.2018
LU24.12.2018
BG28.02.2019
NO28.02.2019
GR01.03.2019
IS28.03.2019
PT28.03.2019
Former [2019/37]AL28.11.2018
AT28.11.2018
CZ28.11.2018
DK28.11.2018
EE28.11.2018
ES28.11.2018
FI28.11.2018
HR28.11.2018
IT28.11.2018
LT28.11.2018
LV28.11.2018
NL28.11.2018
PL28.11.2018
RO28.11.2018
RS28.11.2018
SM28.11.2018
BG28.02.2019
NO28.02.2019
GR01.03.2019
IS28.03.2019
PT28.03.2019
Former [2019/35]AL28.11.2018
AT28.11.2018
CZ28.11.2018
DK28.11.2018
ES28.11.2018
FI28.11.2018
HR28.11.2018
IT28.11.2018
LT28.11.2018
LV28.11.2018
NL28.11.2018
PL28.11.2018
RS28.11.2018
BG28.02.2019
NO28.02.2019
GR01.03.2019
IS28.03.2019
PT28.03.2019
Former [2019/34]AL28.11.2018
AT28.11.2018
DK28.11.2018
ES28.11.2018
FI28.11.2018
HR28.11.2018
IT28.11.2018
LT28.11.2018
LV28.11.2018
NL28.11.2018
RS28.11.2018
BG28.02.2019
NO28.02.2019
GR01.03.2019
IS28.03.2019
PT28.03.2019
Former [2019/30]AL28.11.2018
AT28.11.2018
ES28.11.2018
FI28.11.2018
HR28.11.2018
LT28.11.2018
LV28.11.2018
NL28.11.2018
RS28.11.2018
BG28.02.2019
NO28.02.2019
GR01.03.2019
IS28.03.2019
PT28.03.2019
Former [2019/26]AL28.11.2018
AT28.11.2018
ES28.11.2018
FI28.11.2018
HR28.11.2018
LT28.11.2018
LV28.11.2018
RS28.11.2018
BG28.02.2019
NO28.02.2019
GR01.03.2019
IS28.03.2019
PT28.03.2019
Former [2019/25]AT28.11.2018
ES28.11.2018
FI28.11.2018
HR28.11.2018
LT28.11.2018
LV28.11.2018
RS28.11.2018
BG28.02.2019
NO28.02.2019
GR01.03.2019
IS28.03.2019
Former [2019/24]AT28.11.2018
ES28.11.2018
FI28.11.2018
HR28.11.2018
LT28.11.2018
LV28.11.2018
BG28.02.2019
NO28.02.2019
GR01.03.2019
IS28.03.2019
Former [2019/23]AT28.11.2018
ES28.11.2018
FI28.11.2018
HR28.11.2018
LT28.11.2018
LV28.11.2018
BG28.02.2019
NO28.02.2019
IS28.03.2019
Former [2019/22]FI28.11.2018
LT28.11.2018
BG28.02.2019
NO28.02.2019
IS28.03.2019
Former [2019/21]FI28.11.2018
LT28.11.2018
NO28.02.2019
IS28.03.2019
Former [2019/20]LT28.11.2018
NO28.02.2019
Cited inInternational search[Y]JP2001282127  (SONY CORP) [Y] 1,2,46 * abstract *;
 [Y]WO2007150039  (ASYST TECHNOLOGIES [US]; BONORA ANTHONY C [US]) [Y] 1,2,46 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0006] , [0016] * * figure 1 * * claim 1 *;
 [A]US2014360552  (BRITCHER ERIC BRAMWELL [US] ET AL) [A] 1,2,13,15,17,18,46 * the whole document *;
 [A]KR200465321Y  (DO KYUNG H) [A] 1,2,13,15,17,18,46 * the whole document *