Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3179802

EP3179802 - DEVICE-TO-DEVICE (D2D) OPERATION METHOD PERFORMED BY TERMINAL IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM AND TERMINAL USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  24.11.2019
Database last updated on 21.01.2020
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  04.06.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  12.05.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  01.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip24.11.2019New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Electronics Inc.
128, Yeoui-daero
Yeongdeungpo-gu
Seoul 07336 / KR
[2017/24]
Inventor(s)01 / JUNG, Sunghoon
IP Center
LG Electronics Inc.
19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil
Seocho-gu
Seoul 06772 / KR
02 / LEE, Youngdae
IP Center
LG Electronics Inc.
19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil
Seocho-gu
Seoul 06772 / KR
 [2017/24]
Representative(s)Frenkel, Matthias Alexander
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
[2017/24]
Application number, filing date15829657.407.08.2015
[2017/24]
WO2015KR08315
Priority number, dateUS201462034753P07.08.2014         Original published format: US 201462034753 P
[2017/24]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016021995
Date:11.02.2016
Language:KO
[2016/06]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3179802
Date:14.06.2017
Language:EN
[2017/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR11.02.2016
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.03.2018
ClassificationInternational:H04W72/04, H04W76/14
[2018/15]
Former International [2017/24]H04W72/04, H04W72/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/24]
TitleGerman:DURCH EIN ENDGERÄT IN EINEM DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM DURCHGEFÜHRTES VORRICHTUNG-ZU-VORRICHTUNG (D2D)-BETRIEBSVERFAHREN UND ENDGERÄT ZUR VERWENDUNG DAMIT[2017/24]
English:DEVICE-TO-DEVICE (D2D) OPERATION METHOD PERFORMED BY TERMINAL IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM AND TERMINAL USING SAME[2017/24]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT DE DISPOSITIF À DISPOSITIF (D2D) RÉALISÉ PAR UN TERMINAL DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FILS ET TERMINAL UTILISANT LEDIT PROCÉDÉ[2017/24]
Entry into regional phase01.03.2017Translation filed 
01.03.2017National basic fee paid 
01.03.2017Search fee paid 
01.03.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
01.03.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.03.2017Examination requested  [2017/24]
01.03.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
24.09.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.06.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.10.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.11.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
28.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
26.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XY]US2014206322  (DIMOU KONSTANTINOS [SE], et al) [X] 1-6,8,10-12 * paragraphs [0002] , [0034] - [0039] - [0044] , [0053] - [0058] - [0064] , [0069]; figures 1,6 * [Y] 7,9;
 [Y]US2014094183  (GAO CHUNYAN [CN], et al) [Y] 7,9 * D2D resource pools; paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0019] *;
 [A]WO2013169699  (INTEL CORP [US]) [A] 1-12 * D2D devices send control message comprising their capabilities.; paragraphs [0030] , [0038]; figure 1 *;
 [A]  - QUALCOMM INCORPORATED, "Indication of UE ProSe capability", vol. CT WG1, no. Phoenix; 20140519 - 20140523, (20140526), 3GPP DRAFT; C1-142186, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ct/WG1_mm-cc-sm_ex-CN1/TSGC1_87_Phoenix/docs/, (20140526), XP050808035 [A] 1-12 * Indication of UE ProSe capability; page 1, *
International search[X]WO2013109100  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 1-12 * See paragraphs [0154]-[0175] and figures 13-18. *;
 [A]US2014094122  (ETEMAD KAMRAN [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * See paragraphs [0058]-[0066] and figure 3. *;
 [A]WO2014047907  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [A] 1-12 * See page 14, line 10 - page 15, line 17 and figures 1A-1C2. *;
 [A]US2014092885  (VENKATACHALAM MUTHAIAH [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * See paragraphs [0093]-[0101] and figure 8. *;
 [A]US2013272262  (LI QINGHUA [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * See paragraph [0020] and figures 4-5. *